Hafermann v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: |
Michael S. Hafermann |
Defendant: |
Commissioner of Social Security |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03204 |
Filed: |
September 26, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Warren K. Urbom |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: DIWC/DIWW |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 20, 2013 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Commissioner of Social Security's decision is affirmed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
|
May 22, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend. The plaintiff may on or before June 24, 2013, file and serve a reply brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (JSF)
|
April 17, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend; the defendant shall on or before May 15, 2013, file and serve its response brief; within one week after the defendant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may req uest oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend. The Defendants Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Brief, ECF No. 18 , is granted and the defendant shall on or before April 15, 2013, file and serve its response; 2. within one week after the defen dant's answer brief is filed, the plaintiff may file a reply brief and either party may request oral argument or make any other request which may be permitted under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g); and 3. in the absence of an order setting the case for oral argument or scheduling further proceedings, the case shall be deemed to be submitted at the expiration of the time period specified in paragraph 3 hereof. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
October 15, 2012 |
Filing
7
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The clerk shall restrict access to the Complaint pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(1)(B)(ii). Plaintiff is cautioned to comply with Fed. R.Civ.P. 5.2(a)(1) for all future pleadings. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?