Lautenbaugh v. Nebraska State Bar Association et al
Plaintiff: Scott Lautenbaugh
Defendant: Warren R. Whitted, Jr., G. Michael Fenner, Nebraska State Bar Association and Marsha E. Fangmeyer
Case Number: 4:2012cv03214
Filed: October 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James M. Manley is granted leave to withdraw from this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 THIRD PROGRESSION ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due on or before February 10, 2014; Defendants' response and/or cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before March 10, 2014; Plaintiff's response/repl y regarding the cross-motions for summary judgment is due on or before March 31, 2014; and Defendants' reply regarding their cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before April 14, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadlines set forth in this Court's April 25, 2013 Order are vacated pending resolution of the cross-motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Extend. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before January 22, 2014, suggesting how this case shall proceed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that the plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 8 is denied without prejudice to refiling. The court's order entered on December 13, 2012 34 , which approved the parties' stipulation regarding the motion for preliminary injunction 33 , will otherwise remain in full force and effect. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PROGRESSION ORDER that on or before April 16, 2013, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1); and It is FURTHER ORDERED that, following initial disclosures, the parties shall confer to discuss and develop a proposed plan for further progression of this case and be prepared to discuss that plan during a telephonic status conference on April 24, 2013, at 2:00 pm Central DST. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER approving 33 Stipulation. The parties are ordered to perform the stipulation, and the preliminary injunction hearing is cancelled. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 7 Motion to Certify Class. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Hearing. As previously ordered (see filing 12), Plaintiff's counsel is to arrange with Defendants' counsel to contact my judicial assistant to schedule a conference call for discussion of case progression matter, including discussion of the need for and timing of a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Judge Zwart recuses herself from this case. Judge Kopf will handle this case without the assistance of a magistrate judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lautenbaugh v. Nebraska State Bar Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren R. Whitted, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Michael Fenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska State Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha E. Fangmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lautenbaugh
Represented By: Steven J. Lechner
Represented By: James M. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?