Schardt v. AG Growth Industries Partnership et al
Plaintiff: |
Kelli E. Schardt |
Defendant: |
AG Growth International, Inc. and AG Growth Industries Partnership |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03228 |
Filed: |
November 8, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Warren K. Urbom |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER that pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation and motion for dismissal 56 , this case is dismissed, with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER that on or before January 15, 2014, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal; Absent compliance with this order, this case (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; This case is removed from the Court's trial docket; The Clerk of the Court shall set a dismissal papers deadline of January 15, 2014. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
|
August 16, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend. The deadlines for complete expert disclosures, (both retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(B)), and non-retained experts, (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(C)), are:For the plaintiff(s) excluding Cochran: A ugust 15, 2013For the plaintiff(s) as to Cochran: August 26, 2013For the defendant(s) excluding Cochran: September 16, 2013For the defendant(s) identify additionalexpert witnesses to rebuttal of Cochran: October 8, 2013For the defenda nt(s) complete expertdisclosures as to rebuttal of Cochran: November 5, 2013 All other deadlines shall remain as set forth in the Final Progression Order dated January 23, 2013 (Filing No. 11).Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
34
ORDER that the jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a.m. on December 16, 2013, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of five (5) trial days. The in-chambers conference set for 8:30 a.m. on the first day of trial is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
26
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Amend. Deadline for plaintiff's complete expert disclosures is August 15, 2013. Deadline for defendant's complete expert disclosures is September 15, 2013. All other deadlines shall remain as set forth in the Final Progression Order dated January 23, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (DMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?