Lewis v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: |
Eric F. Lewis |
Respondent: |
State of Nebraska |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv03238 |
Filed: |
December 3, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2013 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Court of Appeals a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; Lewis's Motion to Return Documents 14 and Motion to Appoint Counsel 16 are denied; Lewis's Motion for Status 16 is granted in part and denied in part in accordance w ith this Memorandum and Order; Lewis's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing no. 1) is denied in all respects and this action is dismissed with prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order.Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
February 14, 2013 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-Upon initial review of the Petition (filing no. 1 ), the court preliminarily decides that Petitioners claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. By March 29, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the parties shall follow the procedures set forth within the order. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the parties shall follow the proc edures set forth within the order. The Clerk of the court is directed to set deadline for April 29, 2013 to check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/29/2013:deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment.) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party, Respondent and Nebraska Attorney General as directed)(MKR)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
6
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?