Gonzalez v. Houston
Petitioner: |
Joes E. Gonzalez |
Respondent: |
Robert P. Houston |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv03016 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Petitioners Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP is granted. (Filing No. 19 .) The court finds that Petitioner has shown excusable neglect or good cause for his delayed filing of a notice of appeal. Accordingly, the court extends the time in which Petitioner has to file a notice of appeal, and considers his notice of appealtimely filed. For the reasons set forth in the courts Memorandum and Order dated November 5, 2013, the court will not issue a certificate of appealabil ity in this matter. Accordingly, Petitioners Motion for Certificate of Appealability (Filing No. 20 , Part 2) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying the Petitioner's 16 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioners claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this memorandum and order and the section 2254 petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By July 1, 2013, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgmentor state court records in support of an answer. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth within the order shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner: If Respondent elects to file an answer, the proce dures set forth within the order should be followed. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: August 1, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/1/2013: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER provisionally granting the 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Petitioner is relieved from paying the fee at this time. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?