State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Interline Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company |
Defendant: |
Linx Ltd., Interline Brands, Inc. and Watts Water Technologies, Inc. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv03037 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Warren K. Urbom |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Tort Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 7, 2013 |
Filing
48
ORDER that the Joint Stipulated Motion and Order addressing the personal juriisdiction issue existing is to be submitted to this court on or before October 11, 2013.Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Watts Water Technologies' motion for reconsideration, (ECF No. 30), is denied as moot. Watts Water Technologies' amended motion for reconsideration, (ECF No. 32 ), is denied. Watts Water Technologies' requ est for a hearing, (ECF No. 32 ), is granted in part. A hearing will be held on the question of personal jurisdiction. Within fourteen days of the date of this order: a) the parties must submit a proposed order that includes an agreed-upon hearing date and, if necessary, a proposed expedited discovery schedule; or b) if the parties cannot reach an agreement on these matters, State Farm must file a motion for a hearing. This motion may also include a request for expedited discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
|
September 9, 2013 |
Filing
45
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Interline's and Linx's application for attorney's fees and expenses, (ECF No. 29 ), is granted in part. State Farm may not refile its claims against either Interline or Linx without first paying at total sum of $5,872 to these defendants. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting 41 Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension. The defendant, Watts Water Technologies, shall have on or before August 28, 2013, in which to file and serve its brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (EJL)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER - The Unopposed Motion to Extend Time in Which to Respond to Motion to Reconsider Filed by Defendant, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., ECF No. 38 , is granted and the plaintiff shall have on or before August 16, 2013, to file and serve its response. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (AOA)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED that: State Farm's motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 25 ), is granted in part. State Farm's claims agains t Interline Brands, Inc. and Linx Ltd. are dismissed without prejudice, subject to the condition set forth in the memorandum accompanying this order. Interline Brands, Inc.'s and Linx Ltd.'s motion for summary judgment, (ECF No. 22 ), is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?