Wade Shows, Inc. v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wade Shows, Inc.
Defendant: Perry Martin Ware and YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv03124
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER - Pursuant to conference call held today:1) Pursuant to Neb. Rev. Stat. § 48-118.04 (2), a telephonic hearing for determination of the equitable allocation of any judgment or settlement proceeds owed on Perry Martin Ware's persona l injury claim will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge, on the record, on October 22, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel for all interested parties shall participate in the conference using the call-in information assigned to this case. Se e Text Order 158.2) On or before October 20, 2015, any exhibits the parties intend to offer for the hearing on October 22, 2015, shall be submitted to my chambers by email sent to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov.3) The pending summary judg ment motions, (Filing Nos. 127 , 130 , & 133 ), are denied as moot.4) The motion to file under seal, (Filing No. 166 ), is granted in part. Filing No. 167 shall be filed as a restricted access document.5) The motion to continue, (Filing No. 168 ), is granted. The trial and pretrial conference settings are cancelled, and this case is stayed pending further order of the court.6) If Perry Martin Ware's personal injury claim cannot be resolved by the parties on or before Nove mber 2, 2015, a telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on November 3, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. to discuss a new progression schedule to trial. Wares counsel shall place the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER that the motion for status conference (Filing No. 154) is granted. The motion for leave to restrict (Filing No. 159) is granted. Filing 153 shall remain filed under restricted access. The motion to extend (Filing No. 152) is granted in part and denied in part. The pretrial conference and trial remain scheduled for November 3, 2015 and November 16, 2015, respectively. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MBM)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AMENDED PROGRESSION ORDER granting 82 Motion to Extend. After conferring with the parties: - 5-day Jury Trial set for 11/16/2015 at 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. - Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2015 at 11:0 0 AM by WebEx Conference before Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. An email will be sent to counsel of record with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference by WebEx. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade Shows, Inc. v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Shows, Inc.
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Martin Ware
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Dan H. Ketcham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?