Ortiz v. Rine
Petitioner: |
Lawrence Ortiz |
Respondent: |
Sabotka Rine |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv03139 |
Filed: |
August 6, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
24
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA 21 : leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal will be granted and Petitioner is relieved from paying the appellate filing fee at this time; the court extends the time in which Petition er has to file a notice of appeal, and considers his notice of appeal timely filed; as set forth in the court's Memorandum and Order dated May 29, 2014, the court will not issue a certificate of appealability in this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
|
December 18, 2013 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 11 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cog nizable in federal court. The Clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this memorandum and order and the section 2254 petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By November 25, 2013, Respondent sha ll file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 25, 2013: deadline for Respondent to fi le state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 23, 2013: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(TCL )
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's application to proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is denied. Petitioner is granted until September 13, 2013, to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is warned that if the fee is not paid as required, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 13, 2013: deadline for Petitioner to pay $5.00 filing fee. No further review of this case will take place until the filing fee is paid. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?