Sanders v. Lutter et al
Plaintiff: |
Emmanuel Sanders |
Defendant: |
Richard Lutter, Douglas County, Nebraska, City of Omaha, Nebraska and State of Nebraska |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv03167 |
Filed: |
September 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 14, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. 1 ) is dismissed without prejudice and a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (AOA)
|
December 24, 2013 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot the Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.30 by December 9, 2013, unless an enlargement of time is granted in re sponse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional mon thly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 9, 2013: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(AOA)
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect, or pay the $350.00 filing fee, on or before November 1, 2013. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 1, 2013: deadline for payment or filing of signed IFP application. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(AOA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?