Rajasekaran et al v. Hazuda et al

Plaintiff: Mughil Sriramvenugopal, Kasthuri Sriramvenugopal and Sriram Rajasekaran
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Eric Holder, Jr., Mark Hazuda and Rand Beers
Case Number: 4:2013cv03174
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Seal. The administrative record shall be filed as a restricted access document, accessible to only the court and the parties of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
May 12, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time (filing 18 ) is granted, and, accordingly, that the parties' briefing schedule is amended, as follows: 1. Cross-motions for summary judgment are due on or before May 22, 2014. 2. Cross-opposition briefs are due on or before June 23, 2014. 3. Cross-reply briefs are due on or before July 23, 2014. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
April 3, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 16 Stipulation is approved; the 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is withdrawn; The court's memorandum and order entered on March 27, 2014 (filing 14), which granted a temporary restraining order, is set aside; and The court's scheduling order (filing 11) remains in effect. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)
March 27, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be considered at a later date. Plaintiffs' counsel shall make necessary arrangements with Defendants' counsel to contact my judicial assistant, by telephone at (402) 437-1640, to schedule a conference call between counsel for the parties and myself to discuss scheduling a hearing on the motion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajasekaran et al v. Hazuda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mughil Sriramvenugopal
Represented By: Margaret W. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasthuri Sriramvenugopal
Represented By: Margaret W. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sriram Rajasekaran
Represented By: Margaret W. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rand Beers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?