State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Carquest Corporation et al

Defendant: ATD Tools, Inc., Carquest Corporation, Franklin Auto Parts, LLC, Smart Decision Trading, LTD and Suzhou Gewei Electric Appliance Co., LTD
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv03192
Filed: November 13, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation (filing 101) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MBM)
August 12, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the magistrate judge and to Senior United Sta tes District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. This case is removed from the court's trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MBM)
June 5, 2015 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Stipulations 85 and 87 . The Final Progression Order is amended as stated herein. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
April 30, 2015 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by D. David DeWald on behalf of defendant ATD Tools, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
June 4, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The parties' stipulation 50 resolving the plaintiff's motion to stay, 29 , is accepted, and is hereby ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Stipulation; denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The plaintiff's amended complaint shall be filed on or before February 14, 2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Carquest Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATD Tools, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carquest Corporation
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Auto Parts, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Decision Trading, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Gewei Electric Appliance Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert D. Kinsey, Jr.
Represented By: Tony R. Krall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?