Baker v. Neneman et al
Plaintiff: Robert Baker
Defendant: The City of Omaha, Nebraska, Bruce Holcomb and Lou Ann Neneman
Case Number: 4:2014cv03051
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 10/09/2015. Receipt number 8035114, in the amount of $26.96. (KLF)
August 17, 2015 Filing 20 Letter by Clerk of receipt of payment and balance remaining of filing fee. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff.) (KMG)
August 14, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 08/14/2015. Receipt number 8034355, in the amount of $ 141.39. (KLF)
August 13, 2015 Filing 19 LETTER regarding status of payment of filing fees filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
July 13, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker. Receipt number 8033989, in the amount of $6.85. (KLF) Modified on 8/11/2015 to correct text (KLF).
June 12, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 6/12/15. Receipt number 8-33614, in the amount of $ 6.65. (MKR)
June 12, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 6/12/15. Receipt number 8-33613, in the amount of $ 5.00. (MKR)
May 8, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 5/8/2015. Receipt number 8033134, in the amount of $ 11.60. (GJG)
April 10, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 4/10/2015. Receipt number 8032842, in the amount of $ 6.40. (GJG)
March 13, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 3/13/2015. Receipt number 8032441, in the amount of $ 7.00. (GJG)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT - This case is dismissed with prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order #17 entered on this date. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Baker's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice because his claims were not filed within the relevant statutes of limitation. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 13, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 2/13/15. Receipt number 8-32036, in the amount of $ 6.85. (MKR)
January 9, 2015 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 1/9/2015. Receipt number 8031487, in the amount of $ 13.80. (GJG)
December 15, 2014 Filing 16 RESPONSE regarding Memorandum and Order, filing #15 filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
December 12, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 12/12/2014. Receipt number 8031226, in the amount of $ 27.15. (GJG)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall, within 30 days of this Memorandum and Order, file a response with the court in which he shows cause why this case should not be dismissed as untimely under the applicable statute of limitations. Absent a showing of good cause, this case will be subject to dismissal without further notice. Failure to comply as directed will result in dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter: January 5, 2015: check for Plaintiff's response. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
November 17, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 11/17/14. Receipt number 8030915, in the amount of $26.70. (JSF)
October 10, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of ROBERT BAKER on 10/10/14. Receipt number 8030436, in the amount of $ 12.05. (MLF, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Baker's request for a refund of the filing fee #13 is denied. Baker may file a motion to voluntarily dismiss this action, but he will be responsible for payment of the filing fee even if this case is dismissed. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 29, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION to recover filing fees and MOTION to Withdraw Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
September 15, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 9/15/2014. Receipt number 8030080, in the amount of $ 7.10. (TCL )
August 25, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 8/25/2014. Receipt number 4-6234, in the amount of $ 8.90. (JAB)
August 11, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 8/11/14. Receipt number 8029664, in the amount of $ 7.00. (ADB, )
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The court rescinds its prior orders directing Plaintiff to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $98.35. (Filing No. #6 and Filing No. #8 .) Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.90 within 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 1, 2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL )
July 25, 2014 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Robert Baker. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (GJG)
July 14, 2014 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Robert Baker on 7/14/14. Receipt number 8029336, in the amount of $ 28.60. (ADB, )
June 3, 2014 Filing 10 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (GJG)
April 24, 2014 Filing 9 Response filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to waive his filing fee (Filing No. #7 ) is denied. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff is granted a 30-day extension of time in which to pay his $98.35 initial partial filing fee. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee by May 26, 2014. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by this date, Plaintiff's case will be dismissed. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 26, 2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG, )
April 3, 2014 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT AND APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $98.35 by April 25, 2014, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case will be dismissed. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 25, 2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Plaintiff shall review the "Notice Regarding Summons Forms" attached to this Order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(TCL )
March 13, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (GJG)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER pursuant to General Order No. 2007-12: All pro se civil cases that are assigned to a district judge for trial, whether filed by a prisoner or not, are herewith exempted from the disclosure and conference requirements of F.R.Civ.P. 26, except in pending cases where a scheduling order (or packet) or progression order has been previously issued, the parties shall abide by such scheduling or progression orders. In the future, it will not be the practice of the court to issue scheduling packets in pro se civil cases assigned to district judges. Instead, it will be the practice to issue a progression order, addressing discovery and other issues, approximately 30 days after the last defendant has answered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 12, 2014 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Robert Baker. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (GJG)
March 12, 2014 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)
March 12, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Omaha, Bruce Holcomb, and Lou Ann Neneman. No Summons(es) issued, filed by Plaintiff Robert Baker. (GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Neneman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Omaha, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Ann Neneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?