De La Rosa v. White

Plaintiff: Raul De La Rosa
Defendant: Trooper Mark White
Case Number: 4:2014cv03055
Filed: March 18, 2014
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Bruce Teichman is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(JAB)
June 20, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to withdraw filed by Katie M. Martens, as counsel of record for Plaintiff 44 , is granted. On or before July 11, 2017, Plaintiff shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this ca se; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of counsel. The failure to do so will result in a dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. On the court's own motion, the prior show cause deadline (see Filing No. 43), is extended. The plaintiff shall show cause, on or before July 11, 2017, why judgment should not be entered dismissing his complaint. The failure to do so will result in a dismissal of Plaintiff's claims without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed as directed)(SLP)
June 19, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing plaintiff to show cause on or before 6/26/17 why judgment should not be entered dismissing his complaint. Absent a response, the court will enter judgment without further notice. Show Cause Deadline set for 6/26/2017.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
September 18, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - White's motion to strike De La Rosa's evidence (filing 23 ) is denied. White's motion for summary judgment (filing 13 ) is granted in part and in part denied, as set forth above. De La Rosa's cross-motion for partial summary judgment (filing 21 ) is denied. This matter is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for case progression.Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
November 24, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER- The plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (filing 19 ) is granted. The plaintiff may file his response to the defendant's motion for summary judgment on or before January 5, 2015. The defendant may reply in support of his motion for summary judgment on or before January 15, 2015. The pretrial conference scheduled for January 13, 2015 and trial set to begin on January 27, 2015 are continued until further order of the Court. A telephonic conference with United States Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart will be held on December 3, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss further case progression. Counsel for plaintiff shall place the call. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
October 28, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER-Plaintiff, Raul De La Rosa, is given until November 28, 2014 to show cause why the court should not dismiss the plaintiffs claims for want of prosecution. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the claims filed by the Plaintiff without further notice. Show Cause Deadline set for 11/28/2014.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rosa v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul De La Rosa
Represented By: Katie M. Martens
Represented By: J. Bruce Teichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Mark White
Represented By: Jessica M. Forch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?