Brown v. Nebr. Dept. of Correctional Svs.. et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
Defendant: Stephanie Bruhn, Amanda Holmgreen, Nebr. Dept. of Correctional Svs. and Paul Rodreguiez
Case Number: 4:2014cv03071
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 33 ) is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The court will enter judgment by a separate order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Brown's Eighth Amendment claim against Paul Rodriguez in his individual capacity may proceed to service of process. All other claims against Rodriguez remain dismissed for the reasons provided in the courts order dated June 24, 2014; likewise, all other claims against all other Defendants remain dismissed for the reasons provided in the court's order dated June 24, 2014. (See Filing No. 9 .) The clerk of the court is directed to send to Brown a copy of the Amended Complaint, a copy of this Memorandum and Order, and one summons form and one USM 285 Form for service on Brown in his individual capacity. (See attached Notice Regarding Service.) The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: October 28, 2015: check for completion of service. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party with documents as directed)(GJG)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Within 30 days, Plaintiff must either file an amended complaint or provide written notice to the court setting forth that he intended his Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Filing No. 23 ) to serve as his amend ed complaint. Failure to take either action will result in the court dismissing this action without prejudice and without further notice for failure to diligently prosecute it. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: May 22, 2015: Check for amended complaint or notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 25 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint" (Filing No. 23 ) is granted. The clerk's office is directed to add the following docket text to the already-existing text at Filing Number 23 : "Court will consider this document supplemental to the amended complaint." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must show cause within 30 days why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to diligently prosecute it. Failure to respond to this order within 30 days will result in dismissal of this action without furthe r notice to Plaintiff. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: March 6, 2015: Deadline for Plaintiff to show cause. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Plaintiff's claims seeking injunctive relief in connection with his psychological evaluation, or lack thereof, and his subsequent civil commitment are dismissed. All claims against Defendan ts Nebraska Department of Corrections, Amanda Holmgreen, and Stephanie Bruhn are dismissed. As to Defendant Paul Rodriguez, Plaintiff's claims under 42 U.S.C. §1983 for damages based on the alleged violation of his due process rights unde r the Fourteenth Amendment, mental anguish, double jeopardy, and mental anguish are dismissed. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an amended complaint to: (1) state whether his Eighth Amendment claim is against Rodriguez in his official or individual capacity, and (2) sufficiently allege a claim against Rodriguez. Failure to file an amended complaint will result in dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter: July 23, 2014: Check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. 2 ) is provisionally granted. Plaintiff is not required to pay the filing fee in this matter. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the appropriate officials at the Norfolk Regional Center. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Nebr. Dept. of Correctional Svs.. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Bruhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Holmgreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebr. Dept. of Correctional Svs.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rodreguiez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?