Rinehart v. County of Franklin, et al.
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Rinehart, Sr.
Defendant: County of Franklin, Tonda Mattison and Daniel E. Mazour
Case Number: 4:2014cv03086
Filed: April 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The magistrate judge's findings and recommendations (Filing Nos. 47 , 60 ) are adopted. The magistrate judges's order denying pre-ruling discovery (Filing No. 47 ) is sustained and shall not be disturbed. The plaintiff's statements of objections (Filing Nos. 48 , 61 ) are denied. The plaintiff's motions for leave to amend (Filing Nos. 40 , 57 ) are denied. The hospital defendants' motion to dismiss (Filing No. 14 ) is granted in p art and denied in part, as set forth within the order. The county's motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 18 ) is granted, and the plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice as against the County of Franklin. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that, within 14 days of today's date, the plaintiff shall file a sworn affidavit or a declaration made under penalty of perjury establishing which State he was a citizen of when this action was commenced. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting the Defendants' 52 53 Motion for Leave to cite supplemental authority. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting the Defendant's 28 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until August 1, 2014, to file a reply regarding their motion to dismiss. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rinehart v. County of Franklin, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Franklin
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonda Mattison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Mazour
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Represented By: John M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Rinehart, Sr.
Represented By: John F. Carroll
Represented By: Steven M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?