Pittman v. Kenney
Petitioner: |
Russell S. Pittman |
Respondent: |
Michael L. Kenney |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03096 |
Filed: |
May 7, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 6, 2015 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Petitioner may proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The clerk of the court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (JSF)
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioners 23 claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail copi es of this Memorandum and Order and the Petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By September 15, 2014, Respondent shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answe r. If Respondent elects to file a motion for summary judgment, the procedures set forth within the order shall be followed by Respondent and Petitioner. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the procedures set forth within the order shall be followed. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/15/2014: Deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment; ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 10/15/2014: check for Respondent to file answer and separate brief) Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(MKR)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Petitioner's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?