Rogman v. Colvin
Plaintiff: |
Randy Rogman |
Defendant: |
Carolyn W. Colvin |
Interested Party: |
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03101 |
Filed: |
May 15, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 427 Social Security Benefits |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Recovery of the Social Security Administration's overpayment to the plaintiff in the amount of $30,928.90 during the period from May 2009 to March 2011 shall not be waived, and the plaintiff is liable for repayment of such amount. Final judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
18
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (filing 17 ) is granted. 2. Plaintiff shall file a brief by April 17, 2015; 3. Defendant shall file a brief by May 18, 2015; 4. Plaintiff may file a reply brief by June 2, 2015; and 5. This case shall be ripe for decision on June 3, 2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (TCL )
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Reopen (filing 11 ) is granted. Defendant shall have 21 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to file an answer. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Remand (filing 9 ) is granted. This action is remanded to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further administrative proceedings as described above. The court do es not affirm, reverse, or modify the Commissioner's decision and retains jurisdiction of this action during the administrative proceedings. The administrative proceedings on remand shall be completed by no later than one hundred and twenty (120) days from the date of this Memorandum andOrder. Defendant shall file monthly status reports in this matter at the expiration of thirty (30), sixty (60) and ninety (90) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until September 2, 2014, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed. If Plaintiff does not respond, or if good cause is not shown, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB) Modified on 8/19/2014 to remove reference to pro se party. (JAB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?