Chapman v. Sosa-Gayton et al
Plaintiff: |
Billie Joe Chapman |
Defendant: |
Tim Burns, Douglas County Public Defenders Office, Judge Coniglia and Yvonne D. Sosa-Gayton |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03141 |
Filed: |
July 7, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Prison Conditions |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER denying 28 plaintiff's motion for further continuance and motion to have the defendants served and motion to add claim. This action was dismissedon July 1, 2015 (Filing No. 27 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date, filing 26 , IT IS ORDERED: Chapman's claims against defendant Judge Coniglia are dismissed with prejudice. Chapman's claims against Yvonne Sosa-Gayton and Tim Burns are dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in a habeas corpus action or similar proceeding. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Chapman's Objection (Filing No. 14 ) is overruled. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Chapman must show cause within 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to pay the initial partial filing fee or seek an extension of time in which to do so. Any response must include either a request for an extension of time in which to pay the initial partial filing fee or a declaration under penalty of perjury that Chapman directed prison officials to remit payment of the initial partial filing fee and the y failed or were unable to adhere to his request. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: November 10, 2014: Check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider (Filing No. 12 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion (Filing No. 9 ) requesting waiver of the filing fee is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Billie Joe Chapman shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.82 by within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a writte n motion. The clerks office is directed to send a copy ofthis Memorandum and Order to the appropriate financial officer at plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 9/5/2014: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party and to financial officer )(GJG, )
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the complaint within 30 days of the date of this memorandum and order. Failure to comply with this memorandum and order will result in dismissal of this mat ter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to send to plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: August 18, 2014: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form as directed)(GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?