Montin v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Defendant: Y. Scott Moore, Mario Scalora, Mary Paine, Stephen Paden, Lisa Woodward, Chin S. Chung, Marco Baquero, Eugene Oliveto, Ann Evelyn, Dinesh Karumanchi, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Joanne Murney, Sherri Browning, Lorrene Jurgens, Mindy Abel, Cynthia Petersen, James Allison, Corrine McCoy, Jennifer Cimpl, Shannon Black, Zakaria Siddiqui, Roberto Alves, Kathleen Barrett and Klaus Hartmann
Case Number: 4:2014cv03142
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: FA Gossett
Referring Judge: Lyle E Strom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Filing 102 MANDATE from USCA - 8th Circuit (16-1560) In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 01/19/2017, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #96 . (KLF)
January 19, 2017 Filing 101 COPY of Opinion of USCA - 8th Circuit (16-1560) regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA #96 . (Attachments: #1 Letter To Publishing, #2 Letter to Counsel) (KLF)
January 19, 2017 Filing 100 COPY of Order(Judgment) from USCA - 8th Circuit (16-1560) This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court, briefs of the parties and was argued by counsel. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (TCL)
March 4, 2016 Filing 99 SCHEDULING LETTER from USCA - 8th Circuit (16-1560) as to Notice of Appeal to USCA #96 . (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (KLF)
March 3, 2016 Filing 98 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Notice of Appeal to USCA, #96 , Memorandum and Order #35 , Memorandum and Order #57 , Memorandum and Order #76 , Order #90 , Order and Judgment #94 , Order Granting IFP #97 . Notice of Appeal filed on 03/02/2016 by Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin. (KLF)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal IFP #95 is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
March 2, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEAL regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, #35 , Order on Motion for Judgment,, #90 , Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #57 , Order on Motion for Judgment #94 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin. (Gooch, Michael)
March 2, 2016 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Poverty Affidavit)(Gooch, Michael)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER AND JUDGMENT that the motion #93 is granted; the Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety as to all defendants. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
February 22, 2016 Filing 93 JOINT MOTION for Judgment Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 58(d) by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Mario Scalora, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Wiltse, John)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion #91 entered herein this date, IT IS ORDERED that defendant McCoy's motion for partial summary judgment #79 is granted. Plaintiff's claim of access to court/retaliation is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION - There is no issue of material fact as to the access to court/retaliation claim and McCoy is entitled to judgment as a matter of law. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that the defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings #77 as to the unnecessary and improper confinement claims is granted. Plaintiff's claims of unnecessary and improper confinement are dismissed as to all defendants. The defendants' motion, except for defendant McCoy, for judgment on the pleadings as to the access to the court/retaliation claim is granted. Plaintiff's claim of access to the court/retaliation is dismissed as to all defendants except Corrine McCoy. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
January 4, 2016 Filing 89 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #77 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
December 30, 2015 Filing 88 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #77 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #86 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to Filing #77 and Filing #79 . Plaintiff shall have until December 30, 2015, to reply to defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings and defendant McCoy's motion for partial summary judgment. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
December 9, 2015 Filing 86 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Reply Deadline concerning Defendants MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #79 , MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #77 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that defendants' motion to stay case progression #82 is granted. This action is stayed pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
December 1, 2015 Filing 84 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Stay Case Progression Pending Dispositive Motions #82 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 20, 2015 Filing 83 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Stay Case Progression Pending Dispositive Motions #82 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 82 MOTION to Stay Case Progression Pending Dispositive Motions by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 81 INDEX in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #79 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Corrine McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Corinne McCoy)(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 80 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment #79 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Corrine McCoy.(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 79 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendant Corrine McCoy.(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 78 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings #77 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
November 20, 2015 Filing 77 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #62 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings. The Amended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as to Dr. Scalora. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER- Jury Trial set for 10/3/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2016 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference set for Friday, October 30, 2015 8:30 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. The parties may participate by telephone by notifying Judge Strom's office prior to said date. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 13, 2015 Filing 73 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jointly Submitted) by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William L. Tannehill is deemed withdrawn as counsel for Klaus Hartmann, M.D. The clerk of court shall remove his name from CM/ECF. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
October 6, 2015 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendant Klaus Hartmann.(Tannehill, William)
October 2, 2015 Filing 70 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, FRCP 12 (c) #62 Reply brief by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Extend Rule 26 Meeting Report; the parties shall have until October 14, 2015, to submit their Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
September 28, 2015 Filing 68 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Filing Deadline for Parties Planning Conference Order, Set/Reset All Deadlines #61 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC regarding Stipulated Protective Order #66 . This order is to remain in force until modified by the Court for good cause shown. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #65 Motion for Stipulated Protective Order. This order is to remain in force until modified by the Court for good cause shown. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KLF)
September 25, 2015 Filing 65 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
September 23, 2015 Filing 64 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, FRCP 12 (c) #62 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
September 9, 2015 Filing 63 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, FRCP 12 (c) #62 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
September 9, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, FRCP 12 (c) by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that Motion #59 is granted. The parties shall have until September 28, 2015, to submit their Rule 26(f) report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
August 12, 2015 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Extend #59 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Lopez, David)
August 11, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION to Extend Time to File Meet and Confer Report by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
July 17, 2015 Filing 58 State Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #48 by Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward (Lopez, David)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the defendants' motion to dismiss the state tort law claims and 1983 claim for unnecessary confinement under the Rooker-Feldman doctrine is denied. The defendants' motion to dismiss the state law medical malpractice claim is granted. The malpractice claim is dismissed without prejudice. The defendants' motion to dismiss the retaliation claim is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
June 10, 2015 Filing 56 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to wlamson@ldmlaw.com regarding Notice of Appearance, #55 . Mail/E-mail resent to wlamson@ldmlaw.com. (DKM, )
June 9, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward (Lopez, David)
June 8, 2015 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #51 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
May 29, 2015 Filing 53 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #51 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
May 8, 2015 Filing 52 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #51 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
May 8, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
May 5, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #48 by Mario Scalora (Wiltse, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr on behalf of Defendant Ann Evelyn (Lamson, William)
April 16, 2015 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Mario Scalora, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward, by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of John Maxwell Montin(Gooch, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2015: #1 Amended Complaint Modified By Interlineation on 10/30/15) (KLF, ).
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall have until April 17, 2015, to file an amended complaint. Denying as moot #38 Motion for Reconsideration. The motion to extend deadline #45 to submit the meet and confer report is granted. The parties shall have 30 days after the defendants have filed an answer to the amended complaint to submit their report. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
March 6, 2015 Filing 46 Certificate of Service of 1st Set of Requests for Production by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
March 5, 2015 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Report of Conference by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
March 5, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Gooch, Michael)
February 26, 2015 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint regarding: Complaint #1 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora. (Wiltse, John)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendant Dr. Mario Scalora shall have until March 6, 2015, to file an amended answer. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
February 9, 2015 Filing 41 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Answer to Complaint #37 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora. (Attachments: #1 Submission From Sender text of amended answer)(Wiltse, John)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING LETTER- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/6/2015. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
January 26, 2015 Filing 39 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, #35 #38 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
January 26, 2015 Filing 38 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, #35 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
January 23, 2015 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora(Wiltse, John)
January 20, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendant Klaus Hartmann (Tannehill, William)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is denied in part and granted in part: a) The medical malpractice or professional negligence claim against the defendants in their official capacities is dismissed. b) Defendants' motion to dismiss the individual capacity claims for the medical malpractice or professional negligence claims is denied at this time. c) Defendants' motion to dismiss the Unnecessary Bodily Restraint and Truthful Disclosure claims is granted. However, defendants' motion to dismiss the Access to Courts or Retaliation Claim is denied. d) Defendants' motion to dismiss the medical malpractice or professional negligence claim on the grounds that the physician-patient relationship never existed is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER regarding #32 Motion to Drop Additional Defendants. It is ordered that plaintiff's motion is granted. Chin S. Chung and Stephen Paden are dismissed as defendants in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Defendant's motion for leave to file supplemental support brief #27 is denied as moot. Defendant's motion to strike and substitute supplemental support brief #28 is granted. Defendant Scalora's motion for summary judgment #4 is denied, without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to defer action of summary judgment motion #14 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (SLP)
December 22, 2014 Filing 32 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss Party by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
December 5, 2014 Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #9 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Rajeev Chaturvedi, Chin S. Chung, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
November 28, 2014 Filing 30 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #9 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 25, 2014 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION Defer Action on Summary Judgment Motion regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 Pursuant to Rule 56(d) #14 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 21, 2014 Filing 28 MOTION to Strike Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file supplemental brief instanter #27 goes to attachment to Filing 27 only by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora. (Attachments: #1 Supplement brief supporting Filing 4)(Wiltse, John)
November 21, 2014 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file supplemental brief instanter by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to brief supporting Filing 4)(Wiltse, John)
November 21, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stephanie A. Caldwell on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward (Caldwell, Stephanie)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - The motion #24 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until November 28, 2014, to reply to Filing No. #9 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
November 20, 2014 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading in Opposition to Filing # 9 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 19, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr on behalf of Defendant Mary Paine (Lamson, William)
November 19, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora (Lamson, William)
November 19, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr on behalf of Defendant Jennifer Cimpl (Lamson, William)
November 19, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William M. Lamson, Jr on behalf of Defendant Kathleen Barrett (Lamson, William)
November 18, 2014 Filing 19 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION Defer Action on Summary Judgment Motion regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 Pursuant to Rule 56(d) #14 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss Party. Eugene Oliveto, Cynthia Petersen, Roberto Alves, Marco Baquero and James Allison are dismissed as defendants in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MBM)
November 12, 2014 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION Defer Action on Summary Judgment Motion regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 Pursuant to Rule 56(d) #14 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 12, 2014 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Attorney for Plaintiff regarding Index, #15 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 12, 2014 Filing 15 INDEX in support of MOTION Defer Action on Summary Judgment Motion regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 Pursuant to Rule 56(d) #14 , MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 12, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION Defer Action on Summary Judgment Motion regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 Pursuant to Rule 56(d) by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 12, 2014 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of Plaintiff John Maxwell Montin.(Gooch, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend. Rajeev Chaturvedi is deemed added to the list of defendants in the motion and brief referred to in the motion as if originally named therein. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KMG)
November 6, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #9 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Motion To Dismiss)(Johnson, Blake)
October 31, 2014 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #9 by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
October 31, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward.(Johnson, Blake)
October 29, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Bijan Koohmaraie on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward (Koohmaraie, Bijan)
October 29, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Blake E. Johnson on behalf of Defendants Mindy Abel, Kathleen Barrett, Shannon Black, Sherri Browning, Jennifer Cimpl, Ann Evelyn, Klaus Hartmann, Lorrene Jurgens, Dinesh Karumanchi, Corrine McCoy, Y. Scott Moore, Joanne Murney, Mary Paine, Zakaria Siddiqui, Lisa Woodward (Johnson, Blake)
October 22, 2014 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
October 22, 2014 Filing 5 INDEX in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment #4 by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit MJS Affidavit Binder, #2 Exhibit MJS LRC resignation letter, #3 Exhibit McDermott Complaint, #4 Exhibit McDermott Magistrate's Report, #5 Exhibit McDermott Dismissal, #6 Exhibit McDermott Judgment, #7 Exhibit Martin Habeas Petition)(Wiltse, John)
October 22, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora.(Wiltse, John)
October 22, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney John C. Wiltse on behalf of Defendant Mario Scalora (Wiltse, John)
July 11, 2014 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom and Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett assigned. (MKR)
July 11, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-2745231), by Attorney Michael D. Gooch on behalf of John Maxwell Montin(Gooch, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montin v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maxwell Montin
Represented By: Michael D. Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Scott Moore
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Scalora
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Paine
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Paden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Woodward
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chin S. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Baquero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Oliveto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Evelyn
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinesh Karumanchi
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajeev Chaturvedi
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Murney
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Browning
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorrene Jurgens
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindy Abel
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrine McCoy
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Cimpl
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Black
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zakaria Siddiqui
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Barrett
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: William M. Lamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klaus Hartmann
Represented By: Bijan Koohmaraie
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: John C. Wiltse
Represented By: Stephanie A. Caldwell
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?