Pratt v. Sheriff of Douglas County et al
Petitioner: |
Juneal Pratt |
Respondent: |
Sheriff of Douglas County, Director of Department of Corrections and Warden of the Omaha Correctional Center |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03199 |
Filed: |
October 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Kopf |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 15, 2014 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioners claim is potentially cognizable in federal court. The Clerk of Court is di rected to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondents and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By January 29, 2015, Respondents shall file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 29, 2015: deadline for Respondents to file state court records in support of answer or motion fo r summary judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 30, 2015: check for Respondents to file answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 3 ) is denied without prejudice. Petitioners request for the court to di rect "respondents to deliver [him] to this court" (Filing No. 8 ) is denied in light of the foregoing setting forth the procedure under which Petitioner's claim will be heard. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL) Modified on 12/15/2014 to add copies mailed as directed. (TCL ).
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?