United States of America v. Fox
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: George E. Fox
Case Number: 4:2014cv03211
Filed: October 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6334 and 26 C.F.R. § 301.6334-1(d), the Petition for Judicial Approval of Levy Upon Principal Residence (Filing No. 1 ) is granted. The Internal Revenue Service may levy upon George E. Fox's interes t in his principal residence to satisfy part or all of his unpaid federal income tax liability for the tax years 2001, 2003, 2004, 2006, 2007, 2008, and 2009. Based on the parties' agreement to allow George E. Fox ninety (90) days to pay the remainder of his tax liabilities, the levy shall not be executed until after June 4, 2015, if necessary. The levy may be executed by any authorized officer of the Internal Revenue Service. The property is legally described in this order. The Cler k of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to: George E. Fox, P.O. Box 282, Tilden, NE 68781-0282 and George E. Fox, 203 North Elm Street, Tilden, NE 68781. George E. Fox's Objection to Petition (Filing No. 4 ) is overruled. Pursuant to NECivR 72.2 any objection to this Order shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order. Failure to timely object may constitute a waiver of any objection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed)(GJG)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Mr. Fox's motion (Filing No. 8 ) is granted. The hearing in this matter is rescheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on Friday, March 6, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 7, Second Floor, Roman L. Hruska Uni ted States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Counsel for the plaintiff and Mr. Fox are required to attend the hearing. The Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Fox at: George E. Fox, 203 N. Elm Street, Tilden, Nebraska 68781, Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - A copy of this NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, together with the Petition and Declaration, shall be served upon George E. Fox within 5 days of the date of this Order by the U.S. Marshals Service, or by any manner of service described in Rule 4(e)(l) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (2 Certified copy to USM along with a 1 certified copy of filing no. 1 )(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George E. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Jose A. Olivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?