Akins v. Nebraska Court of Appeals and Supreme Court Justices et al
Plaintiff: |
Samar Akins |
Defendant: |
Nebraska Court of Appeals and Supreme Court Justices and State of Nebraska |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv03218 |
Filed: |
November 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 28, 2015 |
Filing
14
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis 12 is granted. The Clerk's office is directed to provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. The Clerk's office is directed to transmit Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Injunction 13 to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals for ruling. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
|
January 14, 2015 |
Filing
9
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the filing restrictions as set forth in this order are imposed in this court as of the date of this order. These filing restrictions do not prohibit Plaintiff from proceeding as a proponent in any civil claim in this distric t with the representation of an attorney. In addition, these restrictions do not prohibit Plaintiff from defending himself in any criminal or civil litigation brought against him in this district. A separate judgment will be entered dismissing this case for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted in accordance with the court's Memorandum and Order dated November 10, 2014. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
December 1, 2014 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to apprise the Court of his current address, in the absence of which judgment will be entered against him, including the imposition of the filing restri ctions set forth in the Court's order dated November 10, 2014 5 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 2, 2015: check for address. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
November 10, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Akins's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP 2 is denied. Akins's Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Akins is ordered to show cause within 21 days from the date of this order why this Court should not impose the filing restrictions listed in this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?