Sullivan v. Sarpy County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Michael A. Sullivan
Defendant: Jeff Davis, Doctor Dreesen, Greg London, Pamela Reinke, Sarpy County Jail and June Westland
Case Number: 4:2015cv03014
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 39 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court shall not process Plaintiff's appeal to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that if Plaintiff wishes to withdraw his Notice of Appeal 38 and Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal 39 , Plaintiff must inform the court of such withdrawal within 10 days of the date of this order. This court will begi n preliminary processing of Plaintiff's appeal by ordering from Plaintiff's institution a trust account statement reflecting Plaintiff's account activity and balance for the past six months. The clerk of the court is directed to order from Plaintiff's correctional institution a trust account statement reflecting Plaintiff's account activity and balance for the past six months. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (CCB)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Filing No. 19 ) is denied. Defendants' motion to strike (Filing No. 28 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: (a). Plaintiff's Reply, Answer, and Objecti on (Filing No. 25 ) is stricken from the court file. (b). The following paragraphs, or portions of paragraphs, are stricken from Plaintiff's Declaration (Filing No. 26 ): (i). Paragraphs 2, 3, 5, 9, and 10 are stricken in their entirety. (ii). In paragraph 4, the second sentence is stricken. (iii). In paragraph 6, the second and third sentences are stricken. (iv). In paragraph 7, the introductory phrase, "Because of the delay in contacting V. A. Hospital," is stricken. (v). In paragraph 8, the concluding language, "where upon he made request to obtain crutches, the request was denied by London and Reinke; according to Sheriff's (Davis) policy, as told to Plaintiff," is stricken. (c). In all other respects, t he motion is denied. Plaintiff's Request for Oral Testimony (Filing No. 30 ) is denied. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 20 ) is granted, and Plaintiff's action is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Strike or Dismiss 5 is granted. Plaintiff's claims against the Sarpy County Jail, Pamela Reinke and Dr. Dreesen are dismissed in their entirety. Plaintiff's official capacity and state law claims against London, Davis, and Westland are dismissed. The sole remaining claims in this case are the § 1983 claims asserted against London, Davis, and Westland in their individual capacities. Plaintiff's Motion for Remand and Appointment of Counsel 15 is denied. To the extent the motion seeks the appointment of counsel, it is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's "Counter Motion to Strike" 10 and "Objection and Reply to Defendants['] Notice of Consent to Removal" 11 are denied to the extent they seek remand of this case to the state district court. Defendants' Motion to Strike or Motion to Dismiss 5 remains pending. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF) Modified on 4/8/2015 to indicate copy mailed to pro se party (JSF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Sarpy County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Davis
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Dreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg London
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Reinke
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarpy County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Westland
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?