Harper v. Coffy et al
Plaintiff: Clyde Ernest Harper
Defendant: Judge Coffy and Prosecutor Retelsdorf
Case Number: 4:2015cv03033
Filed: March 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Filing No. 17 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.36 within 30 days unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed)(GJG)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Harper's Motion (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with this order. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(DKM, )
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $19.49 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: April 27, 2015: initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Coffy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Coffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosecutor Retelsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Ernest Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?