Overcash v. Big Drive Cattle, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: James A. Overcash
Defendant: Carol Knisley
Debtor: Big Drive Cattle, L.L.C.
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 4:2015cv03039
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION - Appellant admitted that the Debtor was insolvent at the time of Transfers. The record before the Court supports the Bankruptcy Court's factual determination that a bailment relationship did not exist between Appellant and De btor. Accordingly, the Transfers were voidable under 11 U.S.C. § 547(b). Finally, the record before the Court supports the Bankruptcy Court's factual determination that the Transfers were not subject to the ordinary-course-of-business exception under 11 U.S.C. § 547(c)(2). Accordingly, the judgment of the Bankruptcy Court will be affirmed. A separate Order and Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief 17 is granted; Appellant's Reply Brief shall be filed on or before July 13, 2015. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw (Filing No. 9 ) filed by Brian Koerwitz, attorney of record for Plaintiff James A. Overcash, Chapter 11 Trustee, is granted. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overcash v. Big Drive Cattle, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Big Drive Cattle, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Knisley
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Overcash
Represented By: James A. Overcash
Represented By: Kari A. F. Scheer
Represented By: Brian S. Koerwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Patricia M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?