Brooks v. Nebraska Dept. of Corrections et al
Petitioner: |
Clinton Brooks, Jr. |
Respondent: |
Scott Frakes and Nebraska Dept. of Corrections |
Interested Party: |
Nebraska Attorney General |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv03051 |
Filed: |
May 15, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus: General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion for summary judgment (filing no. 9 ) is granted. Judgment will be entered for the Respondents and against Petitioner providing that Petitioner shall take nothing and his habeas corpus petition (filing no. 1 ) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. No certificate of appealability will be issued. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The clerk of the court is directed to mail copies of this Memorandum and Order and the habeas corpus petition to Respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General by regular first-class mail. By Septe mber 29, 2015, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 29, 2015: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 28, 2015: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed and to pro se party)(TCL )
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?