August 25, 2017 |
Filing
147
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk of Court shall provide the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals with a copy of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
|
July 25, 2017 |
Filing
143
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment (Filing No. 135 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
128
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's statement of objections (Filing No. 118 ) is denied. The Magistrate Judge's memorandum and order entered on February 8, 2017 (Filing No. 112 ), is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
127
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for extension of time and motion for leave to file replacement brief (filing no. 123 ) are granted instanter, and Plaintiff's replacement brief (filing no. 125 ) is accepted as timely filed. Plaintiff's original brief (filing no. 121 ) is stricken. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
February 9, 2017 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting the 113 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Jeremy Carther. The Plaintiff's action against said Defendant is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (MKR)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
112
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to amend, (Filing No. 105 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
104
ORDER after conferring with counsel, Plaintiff's anticipated motion to amend the complaint shall be filed on or before January 27, 2017. The deadline for filing motions to dismiss or for summary judgment is extended to February 10, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
99
ORDER - The motion to permit Andrew Strotman to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendant Jeremy Carther, (Filing No. 98 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
|
October 19, 2016 |
Filing
89
ORDER granting 82 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Todd Roberts. Plaintiff's action against said Defendant is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KMG)
|
July 14, 2016 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's jury demand, (filing no. 58 ), is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's statement of objections 31 is denied. The Magistrate Judge's order entered on October 14, 2015 26 , is sustained and shall not be disturbed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JSF)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Judge Gerrard is recusing himself from this case and the Clerk shall refer this matter to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (JSF)
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 12 Elizabeth D. Elliott's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
4
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with five summons forms and five USM-285 forms to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of pr ocess on the United States. If the plaintiff is not requesting service by United States Marshal, Plaintiff's counsel shall, as soon as possible, complete the summons forms and return them to the Clerk of the court to be issued. The issued s ummons will then be returned to plaintiffs counsel for service on the defendant(s). If the plaintiff is requesting service by the United States Marshal, Plaintiffs counsel shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 forms and the summons fo rms and return them to the Clerk of the court. The Clerk of the court will sign the summons form, to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiffs Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service of process. The Clerk of the court will copy the Complaint; Plain tiffs counsel need not to do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff's attorney)(MKR, ) Modified on 7/20/2015 reflect mailed to attorney(MKR).
|