DeJong v. State of Nebraska
Petitioner: Susan M. DeJong
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2016cv03020
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and amended petition (Filing No. 1; Filing No. 13 ) are dismissed with prejudice. The court will enter a separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 29 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. 27 ) is granted. Petitioner shall submit a brief in response to Respondent's brief (Filing No. 24 ) by November 14, 2016. Respondent shall file a reply brief by December 14, 2016. The clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: December 14, 2016: check for Respondent's reply brief. Petitioner's Motion for Status (Filing No. 26 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF ORDER that the Petitioner's Request for Appointment of Counsel (Filing No. 2 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Upon initial review of the Petition (Filing No. 1 ), the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims are potentially cognizable in federal court. By June 13, 2016, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 13, 2016: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in suppor t of answer or motion for summary judgment. If Respondent elects to file an answer, the following procedures must be followed by Respondent and Petitioner: By June 13, 2016, Respondent must file all state court records that are relevant to the co gnizable claims. See, e.g., Rule 5(c)-(d) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Those records must be contained in a separate filing entitled: "Designation of State Court Records in Support of Answer.&qu ot; The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: July 14, 2016: check for Respondents answer and separate brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without fur ther notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: March 9, 2016: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form as directed) (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJong v. State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Susan M. DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?