Marsh v. Phelps County et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronda L. Marsh |
Defendant: |
Louis P. Campana, Jr., Penny Gregg, Phelps County and Gene Samuelson |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv03032 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
4 Lincoln Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cheryl R. Zwart |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 6, 2017 |
Filing
30
JUDGMENT regarding Order on Motion for Summary Judgment 23 and Memorandum and Order 29 . Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Samuelson and Gregg in their individual capacities and Defendant Phelps County (including Samuelson and Gregg in their official capacities) and against Plaintiff providing that Plaintiff shall take nothing and Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice, with costs to be taxed against Plaintiff in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d). Upon taxation by the clerk, the amount of costs allowable to Defendants shall be included in this judgment without any further action by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
26
FINDINGS AND ORDER on Motion to Sever 25 , setting deadlines for filing any objection to severance or consent, cancelling hearing scheduled for today, and ordering entry of default against Defendant Campana in his individual capacity.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
|
December 8, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Samuelson and Gregg in their individual capacities and by Defendant Phelps County, including Samuelson and Gregg in their official capacities, in its entirety. Plaintiff's claims agains t Campana in his individual capacity remain. A telephonic conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be held on December 20, 2016 at 11:45 a.m. to discuss further case progression. To participate in the call, Dial 1-877-336-1828. Enter th e access code 5957780, then hit the # key. Enter the security code: 3032 Press (1) to accept. Press (2) to re-enter. The clerk shal mail a copy of this order to Louis P. Campana, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed as directed) (KMG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?