Kottas v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Kottas
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv03069
Filed: April 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT - On the parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (filing 81 ) the plaintiff's claims against the defendant are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, and complete record waived. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (KLF)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - that the motion to withdraw filed by Steven M Karcher, as counsel of record for Defendant, (Filing No. 55 ), is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Extend. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - The parties' motion to extend, (Filing No. 39 ), is granted. The non-jury trial of this case is set to commence before John M. Gerrard, United States District Judge, in Courtroom 1, United States Courthouse, Lincoln, Nebraska, at 9:00 a .m. on January 22, 2018, or as soon thereafter as the case may be called, for a duration of three (3) trial days. This case is subject to the prior trial of criminal cases and such other civil cases as may be scheduled for trial before this one. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on January 9, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on January 5, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
February 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kottas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Kottas
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Represented By: John P. Weis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?