Schram v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Brian Schram
Defendant: Marilyn Bailey, Shannon Black, Department of Health and Human Services, Cindy Dykeman and Lisa Laurell
Case Number: 4:2016cv03071
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that an Amended Judgment shall be entered, after whichPlaintiff has 30 days to file a notice of appeal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff's 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 25 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - With regard to this court's order dated January 19, 2017 (Filing No. 16 , the United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The clerk's office provide a copy of this order to the United States Marshal. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and e-mailed to USM)(GJG) Modified on 2/1/2017 to show copy mailed to pro se party (GJG).
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claim in his second "Supplemental Complaint" 19 is dismissed for failure to state claim. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's retaliation claim against Black, Dykeman, and Laurell in their individual capacities for their threats to send him to the Norfolk Regional Center may proceed to service of process. All other claims against all other Defendants are dismissed for failure to state a claim. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff a copy of the Complaint, the Amended Complaint, the "Supplemental Complaint," this Memorandum and Order, and three su mmons forms, and three USM 285 Forms for service on defendants Lisa Laurell, Shannon Black, and Cindy Dykeman in their individual capacities. (See attached Notice Regarding Service.) Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of the compl aint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However, Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own motion, an extension of time until 90 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. If requested to do so in this m atter, the United States Marshal willserve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. In makingsuch a request, Plaintiff must complete the USM 285 forms to be submitted to the clerk of the court with the completed summons for ms. Without these documents, the United States Marshal will not serve process. Upon receipt of the completed forms, the clerk of the court will sign the summons forms and forward them to the United States Marshal for service on the defendants, toget her with a copy of the Complaint. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: April 19, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Plaintiff's Motion (Filing No. 14 ) seeking the appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's claims against DHHS and the individual defendants in their official capacities are dismissed. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint asserting cognizable individual capacity claims against the remai ning defendants by September 1, 2016. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: September 1, 2016, check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Filing No. 6 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is provisionally granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schram v. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Dykeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Laurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Schram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?