Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Elecsys Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Defendant: AgJunction and Elecsys Corporation
Counter Claimant: Elecsys Corporation
Counter Defendant: Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv03115
Filed: July 8, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2018 114 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Hemisphere GNSS's Motion to Dismiss AgJunction's third claim for relief for equitable indemnity and contribution (Filing No. 99) is denied without prejudice to reassertion in a properly supported motion for summary judgment.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
November 13, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, (Filing No. 90 ), which is hereby approved. The motion filed by the AgJunction defendants requesting leave to file an Amended Third Party Complaint, (Filing No. 83 ), is granted. The Amended Third Party Complaint shall be filed on or before November 20, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
October 11, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Stipulation Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
August 17, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the expert witness disclosure deadlines are amended. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
August 11, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the expert witness disclosure deadines are amended. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KMG)
June 13, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
January 10, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - THIS MATTER came on for consideration pursuant to the agreement of the parties, Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc., Elecsys Corporation and AgJunction, herein as evidenced by the signatures of their respective counsel below, for entry of a protective order to preserve the confidentiality of certain documents, information, records, and material to be produced in this case. Being fully advised on the premises and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c), the Court hereby ORDERS that the following terms and procedures shall govern the handling of confidential, trade secret, and/or proprietary information produced by any party, third party, or witness in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. Elecsys Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AgJunction
Represented By: Leslie S. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elecsys Corporation
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Elecsys Corporation
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Schudel
Represented By: Bruce A. Smith
Represented By: Todd W. Weidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reinke Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Paul M. Schudel
Represented By: Bruce A. Smith
Represented By: Todd W. Weidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?