Charleston, Inc. v. Pfeil
Plaintiff: Charleston, Inc.
Defendant: Derrick Pfeil
Case Number: 4:2016cv03153
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT on the parties' (37) Stipulation for Dismissal in case 4:16-cv-03153-JMG-CRZ and (33) Stipulation for Dismissal in case 4:16-cv-03154-JMG-CRZ, these matters are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and attorney's fees, complete record waived. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03153-JMG-CRZ, 4:16-cv-03154-JMG-CRZ Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that on or before July 17, 2017, the parties shall file joint stipulations for dismissal, or other dispositive stipulations, together with submitting to the undersigned judge a draft order which will fully dispose of these cases. These cases are removed from the Court's trial calendar. Absent compliance with this order, these cases (including counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of the Court shall set dismissal papers deadlines of July 17, 2017. Member Cases: 4:16-cv-03153-JMG-CRZ, 4:16-cv-03154-JMG-CRZ Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Plaintiff's oral motion (filing no. 21 ) is granted. The Pretrial Conference is scheduled to be held before the undersigned magistrate judge on June 6, 2017 at 9:00 a.m., and will be conducted by internet/telephonic conferencing. A sepa rate order will be filed with the instructions and codes for participating in the pretrial conference. The parties' proposed Pretrial Conference Order and Exhibit List(s) must be emailed to zwart@ned.uscourts.gov, in either Word Perfect or Word format, by 5:00 p.m. on June 2, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KLF)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - A settlement conference will be held before Magistrate Judge Zwart with counsel and representatives of the parties on March 29, 2017, beginning at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. The parties' representatives and/or counsel shall be prepared to participate and negotiate a settlement of this case during the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charleston, Inc. v. Pfeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C. Pease
Represented By: Richard L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Pfeil
Represented By: Erik K. Eisenmann
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: Laura L. Malugade
Represented By: V. Gene Summerlin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?