Strawder v. State of Nebraska et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Duane Strawder
Defendant: Scott R. Frakes, Secretary of State John Gale, Neb Attorney Gen Douglas J. Peterson, Governor Pete Ricketts and State of Nebraska
Case Number: 4:2016cv03161
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's request for dismissal of this action (Filing No. 47 ) is granted. Accordingly, this matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (Filing No. 46 ) is denied as moot. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
January 25, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff must file an amended complaint within 30 days that identifies each defendant by name and states all of his claims (and any supporting factual allegations) against that defendant. Failure to do so will result in the c ourt dismissing this action without prejudice and without further notice for failure to prosecute it. Plaintiff is ordered not to file any other amended pleadings or supplements to his pleadings, aside from the one contemplated in the preceding pa ragraph, without first obtaining leave of the court as required by Rule 15(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rule 15.1 of the local rules of this court. In light of the foregoing, Plaintiff's pending motions (Filing Nos. 33 -[ 42]) are denied as moot. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: February 23, 2017, check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 28, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff shall submit an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $5.63 by March 28, 2017. The clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline with the following text: March 28, 2017: Check for initial partial filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
December 19, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Thomas Duane Strawder shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $5.63 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in respo nse to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to th e court. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/19/2017: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C.  7; 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's 28 Motion for status is denied as moot. Plaintiff's 29 Miscellaneous Motion is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party; Copy mailed to Lincoln Correctional Center) (KMG)
November 1, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Summons (Filing No. 8 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strawder v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State John Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neb Attorney Gen Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Pete Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Duane Strawder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?