Gillock v. Saunders County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: John Gillock
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc., Brian Styskal, Saunders County Corrections, Saunders County Sheriff Department, Saunders County, Nebraska, Unknown Correctional Officers and Unknown Nurses, Physicians & Medical Providers
Case Number: 4:2016cv03190
Filed: December 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time (Filing No. 59 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until January 11, 2018, to file a reply regarding their motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 51 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Filing No. 53 ) is granted, and Plaintiff shall have until December 21, 2017, to respond to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 51 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Defendants' anticipated motion for summary judgment on the issue of qualified immunity will be filed on or before December 15, 2017. Additional discovery for responding to that motion will not be permitted absent leave of the court fo r good cause shown. If this case is not dismissed by summary judgment on qualified immunity, counsel shall contact my chambers within 10 days following that ruling to schedule a case progression conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Filing No. 22 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to stay (Filing No. 23 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC)
July 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend deadlines. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, with "Saunders County Sheriff's Department" and "Saunders County Corrections" removed as named defendants, shall be filed on or before 5/3/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillock v. Saunders County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: J. Scott Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Styskal
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saunders County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saunders County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saunders County, Nebraska
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gregory
Represented By: Brandy R. Johnson
Represented By: Vincent Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Correctional Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurses, Physicians & Medical Providers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gillock
Represented By: Douglas R. Novotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?