In re National Research Corporation shareholder litigation

Plaintiff: Anthony Gennaro, Jr.
Defendant: Donald M. Berwick, Michael D. Hays, JoAnn M. Martin, Barbara J. Mowry, National Research Corporation and John N. Nunnelly
Case Number: 4:2017cv00441
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 49 ) is granted. Plaintiffs' consolidated complaint is dismissed. Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument (filing 62 ) is denied. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - The Joint Stipulation of Defendant Michael and Karen Hays Grandchildren's Trust Without Prejudice (filing 63 ) is approved. The plaintiffs' claims against the Michael And Karen Hays Grandchildren's Trust are dismissed without prejudice. The Michael And Karen Hays Grandchildren's Trust is terminated as a party. The Michael And Karen Hays Grandchildren's Trust's motion to dismiss (filing 51 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CS)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - The parties' motions for preliminary injunction (case no. 4:17-cv-441 filing 9 ; case no 4:17-cv-3152 filing 16 ) are denied as moot. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression. Member Cases: 4:17-cv-00441-JMG-MDN, 4:17-cv-03152-JMG-MDN Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Oppositions to Motions for Preliminary Injunction (case no. 4:17-cv-441 filing 33; case no 4:17-cv-3152 filing 30) is approved. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter a case management deadline for March 1, 2018 with the following docket text: Check on pendency and progression of preliminary injunction motions. Member Cases: 4:17-cv-00441-JMG-MDN, 4:17-cv-03152-JMG-MDN Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND CO-LEAD COUNSEL - IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel (Filing No. 22 in Case No. 4:17CV4 41; Filing No. 22 in Case No. 4:17CV3152) is granted. The parties Stipulation for Consolidation of Related Actions and Appointment of Co-Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel (Filing No. 23 in Case No. 4:17CV441; Filing No. 23 in Case No. 4:17CV3152) i s adopted. The Gennaro Action and the Gerson Action shall be consolidated for all purposes, herein referred to as the "Consolidated Action." The law firms of Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP and Labaton Sucharow LLP will serve as co-lead counsel for Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Action. Anthony Gennaro, Jr. and James D. Gerson shall serve as co-lead plaintiffs in the Consolidated Action. The Bruning Law Group shall serve as liaison counsel in the Consolidated Action. Hereaft er, papers only need to be filed in Case No. 4:17-cv-00441-JMG-MDN. All documents previously filed to date in either of the Gennaro Action or Gerson Action are deemed filed and are a part of the record in the Consolidated Action. Defendants shall h ave no obligation to respond or file an answer to the complaints filed in the Gennaro Action and Gerson Action. A consolidated amended complaint shall be filed in the Consolidated Action and shall be deemed the operative complaint and shall supers ede all previous complaints filed in any of the Gennaro Action or the Gerson Action, or any other action subsequently consolidated herewith. Defendants shall answer or move to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the filing of the consolidated amended complaint. This Order shall apply to this Consolidated Action and any future-filed actions relating to the subject matter of this case. When a case that properly belongs as part of the Consolidated Action is hereafter filed in the Court, this Court requests the assistance of Co-Lead Counsel in calling to the attention of the Court the filing of any case which might properly be consolidated as part of the Consolidated Action, and Co-Lead Counsel is to assist in assuring that counsel in subsequent actions receive notice of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re National Research Corporation shareholder litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. Berwick
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Hays
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoAnn M. Martin
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Mowry
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Research Corporation
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Nunnelly
Represented By: Terry C. Dougherty
Represented By: Kate E. Gehl
Represented By: Bryan B. House
Represented By: Thomas L. Shriner, Jr.
Represented By: Audrey R. Svane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gennaro, Jr.
Represented By: David D. Cookson
Represented By: Grant D. Goodhart
Represented By: Blake E. Johnson
Represented By: Craig J. Springer
Represented By: Michael C. Wagner
Represented By: Eric L. Zagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?