Starr v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rick Starr
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03012
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: F.A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 40 ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference (Filing No. 37 ) is granted. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is rescheduled for May 7, 2018, 10:00 a.m. in my chambers, 111 South 18th Plaza, Suite 2210, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (filing no. 35 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall have until March 12, 2018, to respond to Defendant's motion for summary judgment (filing no. 32 ). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 28 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr v. XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Starr
Represented By: James C. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Represented By: Timothy R. Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?