Hunt v. Johns et al
Plaintiff: Larry Hunt
Defendant: John Does 1-99, Ron Johns, Monument Vision, PC, Oregon Trail Eye Center, PC and Scotts Bluff County
Case Number: 4:2017cv03023
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against defendant Ron Johns in his official capacity are dismissed as redundant of his claims against Scotts Bluff County. Plaintiff's claims against defendants Johns in his individual capacity and Does 1-99 are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). The Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 39 ) filed by defendant Scotts Bluff County is granted. Plaintiff's state-law negligence claims against Scotts Bluff County and Oregon Trail Eye Center, PC, are dismissed without prejudice to refiling in state court. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 29 ) filed by defendant Monument Vision, PC, is granted. Defendant Monument Vision, PC, is dismissed from this case with prejudice. Final judgment shall be withheld pending resolution of the remaining claims against the remaining defendants in this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 26 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Change Place of Trial to the North Platte Division. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket sheet to reflect the place of trial is North Platte, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Johns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monument Vision, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Trail Eye Center, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotts Bluff County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Hunt
Represented By: Frank M. Aerni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?