Weathers v. Shaeffer et al

Plaintiff: Brandon J. Weathers
Defendant: Becky Shaeffer, Kaye Shepard and James Wisecarver
Case Number: 4:2017cv03034
Filed: March 13, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in the proper forum. The court will enter judgment by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
May 12, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff's "Motion to Amend Complaint" (Filing No. 11 ) is granted. He shall file an amended complaint no later than May 26, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
March 17, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Brandon Weathers shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.91 within 30 days, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. Clerk directed to set a Pro Se Case Management Deadline for 4/16/2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff and appropriate official at plaintiff's institution) (CCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weathers v. Shaeffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Shaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaye Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wisecarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?