Harrison v. Lancaster County Sheriff Dept.
Plaintiff: Rodney Harrison
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff Dept.
Case Number: 4:2017cv03042
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal (Filing No. 14 ) was not timely filed. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 15 ) is denied. The clerk of court shall forward a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Because this case is closed, Plaintiff's second Amended Complaint (Filing No. 11 ) and accompanying Affidavit (Filing No. 12 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted by May 31, 2017. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time specified by the court will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline for May 31, 2017 to check for an amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KMG)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Lancaster County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lancaster County Sheriff Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?