Guerry v. Frakes et al
Plaintiff: Brian Frank Guerry
Defendant: Jacob Bents, Keith Broadfoot, Busboom, Michelle Capps, Christopher Connelly, John Doe(s), Flinn, Scott Frakes, Brian Gage, Austin Gocke, Chelsea Guiffre, R. Holly, Frank Hopkins, Andrew King, Crystal Rempel, Shaw Sherman, Daniel Thompson and Christopher Ulrick
Case Number: 4:2017cv03047
Filed: April 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment on Newly Discovered Evidence and Misconduct by an Adverse Party (filing no. 132 , Case No. 8:15CV323; filing no. 86 , Case No. 4:17CV3047) is denied. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (filing no. 117 , Case No. 8:15CV323; filing no. 72 , Case No. 4:17CV3047) is denied without prejudice to reassertion before the Eighth Circuit. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Court of Appeals) (LKO)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Filing No. 115 , Case No. 8:15CV323; Filing No. 70 , Case No. 4:17CV3047) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.77 w ithin 30 days unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution and to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 88 , Case No. 8:15CV323; Filing Nos. 41 , 46 , Case No. 4:17CV3047) is granted. A separate judgment will be entered. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKO)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff Brian Frank Guerry shall have until November 13, 2017, to file any response to Defendants' pending summary judgment motion (Filing No. 88 , Case No. 8:15CV323; Filing No. 41 , Case No. 4:17CV3047). The cl erk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: November 13, 2017: check for Guerry's response to Defendants' summary judgment motion. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Mr. Lopez shall advise the court if the Nebraska Attorney General's Office also represents Andrew King, and if so, shall file a responsive pleading on his behalf no later than October 12, 2017, so that the court may enter a progression order. Mr. Lopez shall also inform the court as to whether the pending summary judgment motion is filed on behalf of Andrew King. Defendants' pending summary judgment motion will not be addressed until after the progression order i s issued and Plaintiff Brian Frank Guerry is given time to respond. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: October 12, 2017: check for responsive pleading for King. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that in accordance with the Memorandum and Order dated June 8, 2017 (Filing No. 80), Mr. David A. Lopez has provided to the court the names and addresses for those defendants not yet served with Plaintiff Brian Frank Guerry' ;s Complaint in Case No. 4:17CV3047. Accordingly, In addition to those Defendants listed in the court's Memorandum and Order dated May 24, 2017 (Filing No. 76), Guerry's Eighth Amendment failure-to-protect and conditions-of-confinement c laims may proceed against the following Defendants in their individual capacities for monetary damages: Paul Tompkins, Lucas A. Roede, Sonny Steele, Adam B. Cropp, and Sarah E. Glass. For service of process on the Defendants in individual capacity, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and a USM-285 form for the Defendants as outlined and provide to the USM for service. The United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plain tiff. The clerk of the court is directed to file under seal any document containing the last-known personal addresses for Defendants Steele, Glass, and King. The clerk of the court is directed to add Paul Tompkins, Lucas A. Roede, Sonny Steele, A dam B. Cropp, and Sarah E. Glass in their individual capacities as parties in Case No. 4:17CV3047, and to terminate "John Doe(s)" as a Defendant in the same. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: October 9, 2017: check for completion of service of process. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (copies provided to USM as directed) (ADB)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying (83) Motion for Reconsideration in case 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE; denying (23) Motion for Reconsideration in case 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff Brian Frank Guerry's Motion to Compel. (Filing No. 79 .) No later than July 8, 2017, Mr. David A. Lopez with the Nebraska Attorney General's Office, as counsel for those d efendants already served, shall provide to the court the full names and addresses of "Tompkins, Case Worker," "Rodie, Correction Officer," "Steele, Correction Officer," and John and Jane Does from Housing Units 2-A and B , to the extent he knows or can reasonably ascertain them. The employment addresses of these individuals will be sufficient if they are still employed with the Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. If, however, any of these individuals is no longer employed with the Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, their personal addresses shall be filed under seal with the court. The court previously ordered the clerk of the court to obtain the last-known address for Andrew King from the Un ited States Marshals Service for service of process on King. (Filing No. 76 .) The Marshals Service has advised the court that there is more than one address for "Andrew King." Accordingly, Mr. Lopez shall also provide to the court the add ress for Andrew King, to the extent he knows or can reasonably ascertain it, in the manner provided in the preceding paragraph. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: July 8, 2017: check for names and addresses from Mr. Lopez. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Guerry's Eighth Amendment failure-to-protect claims may proceed against the following Defendants in their individual capacities for monetary damages: Scott Frakes, Frank Hopkins, Brian Gage, Michelle Capps, Busboom, Christopher Connelly, Shaw Sherman, Austin Gocke, Crystal Rempel, Jacob Bents, Andrew King, Flinn, Christopher Ulrick, Chelsea Guiffre, and Daniel Thompson. Guerry's Eighth Amendment conditions-of-confinement claims may proceed against the f ollowing Defendants in their individual capacities for monetary damages: Scott Frakes, Frank Hopkins, Brian Gage, Michelle Capps, Busboom, Christopher Connelly, Shaw Sherman, Austin Gocke, Crystal Rempel, Jacob Bents, Andrew King, Flinn, Christoph er Ulrick, Keith Broadfoot, R. Holly, Chelsea Guiffre, and Daniel Thompson. Guerry must identify John Doe, a corrections officer in Housing Units 2-C and D, and John and Jane Does, corrections officers, case managers, case workers, and staff wor king in Housing Units 2-A and B, before his failure-to-protect and conditions-of-confinement claims against them can proceed to service of process. Guerry will have 30 days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to take reasonable steps to ide ntify John Doe and Jane Does. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: June 23, 2017: check for names of John and Jane Does. Guerry's remaining federal constitutional claims are dismissed for fail ure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. In Case No. 4:17CV3047, the clerk of the court is directed to obtain the last-known addresses for Defendants Brian Gage, Jacob Bents, Austin Gocke, Chelsea Guiffre, and Andrew King from the Un ited States Marshals Service for service of process and complete 5 summons forms and 5 USM-285 forms for Defendants using the addresses provided by the Marshals Service and forward them together with a copy of Filing No. 1 in Case No. 4:17CV3047 a nd a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service for service of process on Defendants in their individual capacities. The clerk of the court is directed to file under seal any documents containing the last-known personal addresses fo r Defendants Gage, Bents, Gocke, Guiffre, and King. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: August 22, 2017: check for completion of service of process. The clerk of the court is directed to provide th e Clerk of the District Court of Johnson County with a certified copy of this Memorandum and Order. The Clerk of the District Court of Johnson County is requested to notify the assigned state district court judge in Johnson County District Court Ca se No. CI 17-18 that the federal constitutional claims discussed herein may set forth negligence claims under state law and are hereby remanded for his/her consideration. Member Cases: 8:15-cv-00323-RGK-PRSE, 4:17-cv-03047-RGK-PRSE Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(copy mailed to Clerk of the District Court of Johnson County as directed) (ADB)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Guerry's state law claims against Defendants in Case No. 4:17CV3047 are remanded back to the District Court of Johnson County, Nebraska. The clerk's office is directed to provide the Clerk of the District Court of Joh nson County with a certified copy of this memorandum and order. The Clerk of the District Court of Johnson County is requested to notify the assigned state district court judge in Johnson County District Court Case No. CI 17-18 that the state law cla ims in Guerry's petition are remanded for his/her consideration. No later than May 18, 2017, Defendants shall specifically and objectively set forth (a) what additional federal claims and against whom remain in Guerry's state petition, and (b) what federal claims and against whom remain in Guerry's state petition that the court already disposed of in Case No. 8:15CV323. Defendants' motions to consolidate (Filing No. 68 , Case No. 8:15CV323; Filing No. 3 , Case No. 4:17CV304 7) are granted as to Guerry's federal claims. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). Defendants shall file an answer in Case No. 4:17CV3047 no later than May 25, 2017. The court will thereafter issue a progression order for the consolidated cases. Defendant s' summary judgment motion in Case No. 8:15CV323 (Filing No. 63 ) is denied without prejudice to reassertion. Guerry's "Motion for Objection to Summary Judgment" (Filing No. 71 , Case No. 8:15CV323) is denied as moot. The clerk& #039;s office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: May 18, 2017: check for Defendants' pleading setting forth federal claims. The clerk's office is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: May 25, 2017: check for Defendants' Answer in Case No. 4:17CV3047. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' motion (Filing No. 8 ) is granted. All named defendants shall have until 14 days after the court resolves the pending removal and consolidation issues to file a responsive pleading in this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - No later than April 25, 2017, Defendants shall submit a brief (filed in both cases) addressing Montin and whether (a) I have subject matter jurisdiction to decide any claim made by Mr. Guerry under the STCA; and (b) if I lack s ubject matter jurisdiction to decide any claim made by Mr. Guerry under the STCA, what specific portions of the underlying pleading filed in state court must be remanded. Mr. Guerry may also file a brief no later than April 25, 2017, addressing these same questions but he is not required to do so. The motions to consolidate (Filing No. 68, Case No. 8:15CV323; Filing No. 3 , Case No. 4:17CV3047) are held in abeyance and Mr. Guerry need not respond to the motions until further order of the court. The summary judgment motion filed in Case No. 8:15CV323 (Filing Nos. 63) is held in abeyance and Mr. Guerry need not respond to it until further order of the court. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerry v. Frakes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Bents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Broadfoot
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busboom
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Connelly
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flinn
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Gocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea Guiffre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Holly
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Hopkins
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Rempel
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw Sherman
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Thompson
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ulrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Frank Guerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?