Swaroff v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Cynthia Swaroff
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2017cv03063
Filed: May 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Plaintiff Cynthia Swaroff's Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Defendant (Filing No. 17 ) is denied. Swaroff's Objection to Findings of Magistrate (Filing No. 16 ) is overruled and the Findings and Recommendation are adopted in their entirety. This case is dismissed, without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that plaintiff Cynthia Swaroff's Motion to Enlarge Time to File Proof of Service (Filing No. 11 ) is denied. This Order does not alter the time Cynthia Swaroff has to object to the magistrate judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 10 ). Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until September 12, 2017, to show cause why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or for want of prosecution. The failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Brett T. McArthur is to pay the biennial assessment. On or before July 28, 2017, attorney Brett T. McArthur, shall pay the assessment or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the court removing Mr. McArthur as counsel of record for the plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swaroff v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Swaroff
Represented By: Brett T. McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?