Wang Anderson v. The State of Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Yang Wang Anderson
Defendant: Tina Anderson, Kara Beals, Kersten Borer, Susan Boyles, Mercedes Brown, Children's Hospital and Medical Center, Christian Heritage, County of Douglas, Elizabeth Crnkovich, Sonia Derr, Mark Gentile, Amanda Gurock, Tyler Hansen, Martin Harrington, Carla Heathershaw-Risko, Matthew Heys, John Does 1-15, Christina Johnson-Gunn, KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska, Inc., Laurea Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc., Judy McAuliffe-Treinen, Millard Public Schools, Chad A. Miller, Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services, Nebraska Families Collaborative, David Newell, Papillion LaVista Community Schools, Nancy E. Parke, Nicole Paul, Anne Petzel, Courtney Phillips, Jennice Reid-Hansen, Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc., Anna Richardson, Jennifer Richey, Sarita Ruma, Amy Schuchman, Deanna "Nina&quot Sheller, Sara Smith, The State of Nebraska, Gregory Tiemann, Janine Ucchino, Douglas Weinberg, Brenda Wheeler, Jennifer White and Evan Winans
Case Number: 4:2017cv03073
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M. Bazis
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - KVC's motion for entry of final judgment (filing 576 ) is denied. Alegent and Bhatia's motion for entry of final judgment (filing 579 ) is denied. The plaintiff's motion to extend (filing 582 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER - The Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff (Filing No. 573 ) is granted. Mr. Barber shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and thereafter file proof of service showing compliance with this Order, listing the names and addresses of the persons to whom notice was sent. Mr. Barber will not be relieved of applicable duties to the Court, Plaintiff, and opposing counsel until proof of service is filed. Upon the filing of proof of service pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order, Plaintiff will be deemed to be proceeding pro se, that is, without the assistance of counsel, unless substitute counsel has entered a written appearance on her behalf. If substitute counsel has not entered a written appearance, Plaintiff shal l file a written notice with the Clerk of Court, notifying the Court of Plaintiffs current address and telephone number. Plaintiff shall do so within five (5) business days of being served with this Order. Plaintiff may retain substitute counsel at a ny time. However, until such time as substitute counsel enters a written appearance, Plaintiff shall comply with all orders of this Court, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with these requirement s may result in the imposition of sanctions, including payment of costs and attorneys fees, and/or dismissal of this action. Upon Mr. Barber's submission of proof of service as described in Paragraph 2 of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall terminate his appearance and terminate further notices to him in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Wang Anderson's Motion for Reconsideration and for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (filing 510 ) is denied. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy emailed to Magistrate Judge Bazis)(LAC)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER - The parties' stipulation (filing 527 ) is approved. The plaintiff's claims against Kersten Borer are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay her own costs. Borer is terminated as a party to this action. Borer's pending motion for summary judgment (filing 506 ) is denied as moot. Borer's pending objection (filing 525 ) is overruled as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 516 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Reliable Rock defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings (filing 488 ) is granted. Wang Anderson's claims against Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C., Amanda Gurock, Komi Amededji, and Judy McAuliffe- Treinen are dismissed. Reliable Rock Counseling and Consulting, P.C., Amanda Gurock, Komi Amededji, and Judy McAuliffe-Treinen are terminated as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Project Harmony's motion to dismiss (filing 359 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 501 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The State Defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 261 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth above. Courtney Phillips, Douglas Weinberg, Camas Steuter, and Elizabeth Crnkovich are terminated as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Millard Defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 247 ) is granted. Wang Anderson's claims against the Millard Public Schools, Matthew Heys, Gregory Tiemann, and Susan Hancock are dismissed. Millard Public Schools, Matthew Heys, Gregory Tiemann, and Susan Hancock are terminated as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The County Defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 221 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as set forth above. Amy Schuchman is terminated as a party. The County Defendants' motion to strike (filing 221 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 280 Motion to Dismiss. Christian Heritage Children's Home's Motion to Dismiss 280 is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC - Johnson-Gunn's motion to dismiss (filing 217 ) is granted. The Children's Defendants motion to dismiss (filing 249 ) is granted in part and in part denied. The Alegent Defendants' motion to dismis s (filing 254 ) is granted. Wang Anderson's § 1983 claim against Haney, based on alleged violation of her right to due process, may proceed. All other claims as to the moving defendants are dismissed. Johnson-Gunn, Children's, Harrington, Vance, Beals, Ruma, Alegent, and Bhatia are dismissed as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 481 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - X.C.W.'s claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to modify the case caption with respect to Wang Anderson by striking "Individually and on behalf of and as the 'Next Friend' ; of minor X.C.W." Derr's motion to dismiss (filing 242 ) is granted. Reid-Hansen and Hansen's motion to dismiss (filing 251 ) is granted. Tina Anderson's motion to dismiss (filing 266 ) is granted. Reid-Hansen and Hansen's motion to strike (filing 387 ) is denied as moot. Derr, Reid-Hansen, Hansen, and Tina Anderson are terminated as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 452 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on the Motion to Dismiss 203 filed by Janine Ucchino. Ucchino's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 203 is granted. Ucchino is terminated as a party. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (MKR)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Papillion La Vista's Motion to Dismiss (filing 196 ) is denied without prejudice. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression upon disposition of the other pending motions to dismiss. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The motion to dismiss (filing 214 ) of defendants Susan Boyles and the Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia is granted. The motion to dismiss (filing 240 ) of Laureate Psychiatric Clinic and Nancy E. Parke is granted. Wang Anderson's claims against Boyles, Remuda Ranch, Laureate, and Parke are dismissed. Boyles, Remuda Ranch, Laureate, and Parke are terminated as parties. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang Anderson v. The State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Beals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kersten Borer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Children's Hospital and Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Heritage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Crnkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gurock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Heathershaw-Risko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Heys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Johnson-Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVC Behavioral Healthcare Nebraska, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurea Psychiatric Clinic and Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy McAuliffe-Treinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millard Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Families Collaborative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papillion LaVista Community Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy E. Parke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Petzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennice Reid-Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remuda Ranch Center for Anorexia and Bulimia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarita Ruma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Schuchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna "Nina&quot Sheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Tiemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Ucchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Winans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Yang Wang Anderson
Represented By: Joshua D. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?