Torres v. Frakes
Petitioner: Marco E. Torres, Jr.
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2017cv03078
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Presiding Judge: Robert F. Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing No. 26 ) is granted. Petitioner shall file the Amendment to Petition (Filing No. [26-1]) on or before January 19, 2018. Respondent shall file an answer or other res ponsive pleading within thirty days of the filing of the Amendment to Petition. Petitioner's Motion Requesting Additional Relevant State Court Documents to be Filed (Filing No. 21 ) is granted. Respondent shall file the requested additional documents on or before February 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER UPON INITIAL REVIEW - The Clerk of Court shall serve copies of this order and the petition to the respondent and the Nebraska Attorney General. On or before July 31, 2017, the respondent shall file a response. The Clerk of Court shall set a cas e-management deadline for this date. Whether filing an answer or a motion for summary judgment, the respondent shall file (1) a pleading entitled "Designation of Relevant State Court Records," and (2) copies of all records described in tha t designation. If Torres determines that the respondent's designation is insufficient, he shall have ten days to file a motion specifically requesting additional documents and explaining the reasons the documents are relevant to his claims. Whet her the respondent files an answer or a motion for summary judgment, Torres shall file any reply within thirty days after service of the respondent's answer or motion. If either party moves for a stay and abeyance of Torres's federal petiti on pending resolution of Torres's motion for post-conviction relief in state court, such party must file a brief in support addressing the relevant issues identified in Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269, 277-78 (2005), and its progeny. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copies provided as directed) (JSF)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STRICKEN-MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $40.48 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and f orward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 7/24/2017:initial partial filing fee payment due. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR) Modified on 6/23/2017 to remove copy mailed.(MKR). Modified on 6/23/2017 to strike per Order 9 (MKR).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Represented By: James D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marco E. Torres, Jr.
Represented By: Susanne H. Bales
Represented By: Robert B. Creager
Represented By: Stephen A. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?