Emrit v. Gale et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Democratic Party of the State of Nebraska and John A. Gale
Case Number: 4:2017cv03133
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to prosecute it diligently and failed to comply with this court's orders. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
February 20, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff may not proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court is directed to provide a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Eighth Circuit Court of Appeals. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO)
February 15, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STRICKEN ORDER - This matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the court's filing fee, and for failure to comply with a court order. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) Modified on 2/15/2018 (LKO).
January 29, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 12 ) and Second Amended Complaint (Filing No. 13 ) shall be stricken from the court file as unauthorized pleadings. Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to file an amended compl aint that states a claim on which relief may be granted against Defendants. Failure to file an amended complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Filing No. 7 ), Motion to Request a Rule 16 Hearing (Filing No. 8 ), Motion for Summary Judgment (Filing No. 9 ), Motion to Compel Discovery (Filing No. 10 ), and Motion to Subpoena Witnesses (Filing No. 11 ) are denied without prej udice to reassertion in the event Plaintiff files an amended complaint that states a claim upon which relief can be granted. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 28, 2018: check for amended complaint. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
October 13, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. Plaintiff is advised that the next step in his case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of his claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. Gale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Party of the State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?