Lambert v. Costello

Plaintiff: Douglas Lambert
Defendant: Maurice W. Costello
Case Number: 4:2018cv03038
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER compelling Plaintiff's discovery responses. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
September 14, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - A hearing will be held by telephone on September 21, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. to discuss the pending discovery disputes. The parties shall use the conferencing information assigned to this case, (see Filing No. 16 ), to participate in the hearing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
September 11, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice W. Costello
Represented By: Michael L. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Lambert
Represented By: Mark R. Richardson
Represented By: Peter C. Wegman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?