Olsen v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Olsen
Defendant: Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC and Nelnet, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03081
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Michael D. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER - Smith's claims are dismissed without prejudice, and Smith is terminated as a party. The plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend (filing 99 ) and the defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 105 ) remain pending as to plaintiff Jessica Olsen. The motion to withdraw of Smith's counsel (filing 109 ) is denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - The parties' NECivR 29.1 Discovery Stipulation and Request to Adjourn and Reset Status Hearing (Filing No. 98 ) is granted. The deadline to complete one Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of defendants is extended to February 28, 2020. The status conference scheduled for February 28, 2020, is cancelled. A status conference to further discuss case progression will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 6, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - A telephone conference was held on December 10, 2019, with counsel for the parties concerning Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule (Filing No. 79 ). In accordance with the matters discussed during the conference, the Court finds good cause to grant the requested extensions. Accordingly, that Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery Schedule (Filing No. 79 ) is granted and the final progression order is amended as follows: A status conference to further discuss case progression will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on February 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the defendants' motion to certify issues for interlocutory appeal (filing 46 ) is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion to dismiss (filing 39 ) is granted in part and in part denied. The plaintiffs' claims for tortious interference with a contract or business relationship and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed. This matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for case progression. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. Nelnet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Diversified Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet, Inc.
Represented By: Charles F. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Olsen
Represented By: David A. Domina
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Anthony J. Fiorentino
Represented By: Cassandra P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?