Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services v. Dunlop

Plaintiff: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services
Defendant: N. Curtis Dunlop
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Garnishee: Chiropractic Life Center and Discover Bank
Undetermined: State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 4:2018cv03101
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:3203
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 Summons and Order of Garnishment, with attachments, issued to Garnishee, Discover Bank. (LKO)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 Summons and Order of Garnishment, with attachments, issued to Garnishee, Chiropractic Life Center. (LKO)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT AND PRAECIPE for Summons in Garnishment by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Garnishee State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services. (LKO)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT AND PRAECIPE for Summons in Garnishment by Attorney Kevin L. Griess on behalf of Garnishee State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services. (LKO)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw Garnishment. The garnishment Plaintiff filed in this action on September 7, 2018 is hereby deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Garnishment by Attorney Michael A. Greenlee on behalf of Creditor State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services.(CS)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael A. Greenlee has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT AND PRAECIPE for Summons in Garnishment by Attorney Michael A. Greenlee on behalf of Creditor State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services. (LKO)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 WRIT OF EXECUTION (COPY) issued as to N. Curtis Dunlop. Copy emailed to counsel for service. (LKO)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - that Plaintiff's Application for Writ of Execution (Filing No. #3 ) is granted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 27, 2018 Remark - Public: Documents have been filed subsequent to the Registration of Judgment. Therefore, the case number 4:18mc3055 has been change to 4:18cv3101 and Judge John Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan Bazis have been assigned. (LKO)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION by Attorney Vicki L. Adams on behalf of Plaintiff Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Application for Writ, #2 Supplement Execution)(Adams, Vicki)
June 15, 2018 Filing 2 Transmittal Letter with attached docket sheets from USBC-Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet BK16-41913, #2 Docket Sheet A17-04009) (LKO)
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Judgment from District of USBC-Nebraska; Case Number 17-04009 in the amount of $18,668.69 against defendant N. Curtis Dunlop in favor of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services v. Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Curtis Dunlop
Represented By: James C. Bocott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska Department of Health & Human Services
Represented By: Vicki L. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Lincoln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Chiropractic Life Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: State of Nebraska Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kevin L. Griess
Represented By: Michael A. Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?