Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC v. State of Nebraska et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by German drug manufacturer Fresenius Kabi against the State of Nebraska over the drugs used for lethal injection.

Plaintiff: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Defendant: State of Nebraska, Scott Frakes and Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Interested Party: State of Indiana, Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, L.L.P., State of Louisiana, State of Idaho, State of Arizona, State of South Carolina, State of Utah, State of Florida, State of Texas, State of Oklahoma, State of Tennessee, State of Alabama, State of Nevada, State of Arkansas and State of Georgia
Intervenor: Sandoz, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv03109
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 65 MANDATE from USCA - 8th Circuit (18-2717) In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 08/13/2018, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter regarding Interlocutory Appeal #40 . (KLF)
August 30, 2018 64 Featured Case ORDER - that the Clerk shall close this case. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to Andrew Kantra and Noel B. Ix) (KLF)
August 29, 2018 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC (Christensen, Mark) Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct event (CS).
August 29, 2018 62 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Sandoz Inc. for Leave to Intervene as Plaintiff (CORRECTED) by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Intervenor Sandoz, Inc. (Christensen, Mark) Modified on 8/30/2018 to change to motion event (CS).
August 29, 2018 61 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Sandoz Inc. for Leave to Intervene as Plaintiff by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Intervenor Sandoz, Inc. (Christensen, Mark)
August 27, 2018 60 Featured Case TEXT ORDER - The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and to Respond to Intervenor's Motion to Intervene (Filing No. #59 ) is GRANTED. The Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Filing No. #1 ) and to respond to potential Intervenor Sandoz, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene (Filing No. #44 ) is extended until September 18, 2018. The Clerk of Court shall adjust such deadlines accordingly. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to Andrew Kantra and Noel B. Ix) (KLF)
August 24, 2018 59 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading , UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to MOTION to Intervene #44 by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska.(Lopez, David)
August 15, 2018 58 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Noel B. Ix has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
August 15, 2018 57 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew Kantra has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
August 13, 2018 56 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT by Nebraska State Senator Ernie Chambers. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
August 13, 2018 55 Featured Case RESTRICTED ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 13, 2018 54 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 08/13/2018 9:52:19 AM ]. File Size [ 6426 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:26:47 ]. (Motion Hearing). (auto-docket).
August 13, 2018 53 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf in Lincoln on 08/13/2018. Oral argument hearing held regarding Motion to Intervene #44 filed by Sandoz, Inc. Briefs to be submitted. Appearance for Intervenor Sandoz, Inc.: Mark A. Christensen and Nathan D. Clark; Defendants: James D. Smith and David A. Lopez; Interested Party Cline, Williams, Wright, Johnson, & Oldfather, L.L.P.: Richard P. Jeffries; Courtroom Deputy: Connie Schultz; Court Reporter: digital; Time Start: 9:58 a.m. Time Stop: 10:38 a.m. Time in Court: 27 Minutes. (CS)
August 13, 2018 52 COPY of Judgment from USCA - 8th Circuit (18-2717) This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court and briefs of the parties. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the order of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (KLF)
August 13, 2018 51 COPY of Opinion of USCA - 8th Circuit (18-2717) regarding Interlocutory Appeal #40 . (Attachments: #1 Letter by Clerk) (KLF)
August 13, 2018 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Interested Party Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, L.L.P. (Jeffries, Richard)
August 12, 2018 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that at the end of the hearing on Friday, after I denied the request for a TRO, counsel for Plaintiff asked that I enjoin the defendants. I was confused and asked him to clarify. I asked him how his request was different from what I had just done by denying a TRO. He said something like it was not very different. He also said something about needing to orally move for an injunction for purposes of taking an appeal to the Court of Appeals. I orally denied the oral motion after hearing from counsel for the Defendants. At that time (and now) there was pending a written motion for a preliminary injunction #8 that was separate from the motion for a temporary restraining order #7 . To be clear for the Court of Appeals, I have not denied the motion for preliminary injunction. I would have only done so if I had taken live testimony which I did not do, with the agreement of both parties, when I heard the TRO request. If counsel's oral motion was intended as a back door way of boosting Plaintiffs jurisdictional posture in the Court of Appeals, I wish to make clear that the motion for a preliminary injunction and the request for a permanent injunction remain pending. Thus, it is an open question to be decided by the Court of Appeals whether Plaintiff fits within the limited jurisdictional exception for appeals of the denial of temporary restraining orders. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the Clerk shall as soon as reasonably possible provide the Court of Appeals with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy electronically sent to Court of Appeals and Michael Gans) (JLS)
August 11, 2018 50 Featured Case TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's request for an expedited transcript of the hearing held on 08/10/18 is granted. Rogene S. Schroder shall prepare an expedited one-day transcript. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (DKM)
August 11, 2018 47 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing regarding Text Order 46 . The MOTION to Intervene #44 is set for hearing in whatever courtroom is available on August 13, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in the Robert V. Denney Federal Building in Lincoln, Nebraska. (JLS)
August 11, 2018 46 Featured Case TEXT ORDER regarding the Motion to Intervene #44 . The Motion to Intervene will be heard in whatever courtroom is available on Monday, August 13, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in the Robert V. Denney Federal Building in Lincoln, Nebraska. Counsel for the Intervenor is notified that the Court is considering sanctions under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Judge Kopf notes that the Motion to Intervene was filed at 3:49 p.m. on Saturday, August 11, 2018. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JLS)
August 11, 2018 45 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Intervene #44 by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Intervenor Sandoz, Inc..(Christensen, Mark)
August 11, 2018 44 MOTION to Intervene by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Intervenor Sandoz, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Christensen, Mark)
August 11, 2018 43 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf held on August 10, 2018. Total Number of Billable Pages: 36. Total Number of Pages: 36. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Rogene S. Schroder at (402) 661-7383 or roschrod79@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2018. (RSS)
August 10, 2018 42 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by Clerk to USCA regarding Interlocutory Appeal #40 and Memorandum and Order #38 . Notice of Appeal filed on 08/10/2018 by Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES - FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH THE DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. (KLF)
August 10, 2018 41 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 08/10/2018 2:51:50 PM ]. File Size [ 13736 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:57:14 ]. (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Hearing). (auto-docket).
August 10, 2018 40 INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL regarding Memorandum and Order #38 by Attorneys James M. Bausch, Mark A. Christensen, and Nathan D. Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. Filing fee $505. Receipt number 4007349. (KLF)
August 10, 2018 39 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf in Lincoln on 08/10/2018. Oral argument hearing held on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 . The Court takes judicial notice of the court file as it exists at the time of hearing. Plaintiff's oral objection to Defendants' Index of Evidence #26 is overruled without prejudice to reassertion at a later date if necessary. Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 . Memorandum and Order forthcoming. Expedited Transcript of proceedings ordered. Appearance for Plaintiff: Mark A. Christensen and Nathan D. Clark; Defendants: Ryan S. Post, James D. Smith, and David A. Lopez; Courtroom Deputy: Connie Schultz; Court Reporter: digital; Time Start: 3:01 p.m. Time Stop: 3:58 p.m. Time in Court: 57 Minutes. (CS)
August 10, 2018 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that the motion for a temporary restraining order (Filing No. #7 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 10, 2018 37 INDEX in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Supplemental) by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 10, 2018 36 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Conference Call proceedings before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf Total Number of Billable Pages: 8. Total Number of Pages: 9. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the courts public terminal or purchased through Transcriber Lori J. Sehnert at (402) 477-8425 or contact@generalreportingservice.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 5 business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 8/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018. (Sehnert, Lori)
August 10, 2018 35 Featured Case ORDER - The evidence objection (filing no. #28 ) submitted by Defendants is denied without prejudice to reassertion should a preliminary injunction or permanent injunction hearing be necessary. The unopposed motion for leave file an Amici Curiae brief (filing no. #31 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 10, 2018 34 Featured Case TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Motion for Leave #29 and Motion for Leave #30 are stricken for the following reasons: Pursuant to information received from attorney Dylan Jacob, the documents contain incorrect information regarding the joining states. The correct document has been filed at Filing No. #31 . Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KMG)
August 10, 2018 33 REPLY BRIEF in support of its Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 10, 2018 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 9, 2018 31 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (corrected) by Attorney Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Bronni, Nicholas)
August 9, 2018 30 STRICKEN - UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief (corrected) by Attorney Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Bronni, Nicholas) Modified on 8/10/2018 to reflect the document is stricken pursuant to Filing No. 34 (KMG).
August 9, 2018 29 STRICKEN - UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief by Attorney Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief)(Bronni, Nicholas) Modified on 8/10/2018 to reflect the document is stricken pursuant to Filing No. 34 (KMG).
August 9, 2018 28 OBJECTION to Index #9 , Attachment - Continued #10 Evidence Objections by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska.(Post, Ryan)
August 9, 2018 27 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery #7 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #8 by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska.(Post, Ryan)
August 9, 2018 26 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery #7 , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #8 by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Scott R. Frakes)(Post, Ryan)
August 9, 2018 25 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #24 for attorney Nicholas J. Bronni. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
August 9, 2018 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3739252 by Attorney Nicholas J. Bronni on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska.(Bronni, Nicholas)
August 9, 2018 23 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #22 for attorney Dylan L. Jacobs. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KMG)
August 9, 2018 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-3739218 by Attorney Dylan L. Jacobs on behalf of Defendant State of Nebraska.(Jacobs, Dylan)
August 9, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER - Upon application of a member of the press, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that members of the press holding valid press credentials are authorized to bring laptops to the hearing scheduled for Friday, August 10, 2018, at 3:00 p.m., and are authorized to live tweet their personal descriptions of the proceedings. However, no one may record the proceedings by audio or video. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CS)
August 8, 2018 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Danielle L. Jones on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska (Jones, Danielle)
August 8, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER - A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Filing No. #7 ) will take place from 3:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. on Friday, August 10, 2018, in Courtroom No. 1, Robert V. Denney United States Courthouse and Federal Building, 100 Centennial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. Counsel have requested, and the court has agreed, to issue a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order from the bench at the conclusion of such hearing, to be supplemented by a written order if necessary. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
August 8, 2018 18 Featured Case *EXPEDITED* LETTER BY CLERK that a transcript request was sent to General Reporting for transcription regarding Conference Call 16 . Transcript ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (KLF)
August 8, 2018 17 AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 08/08/2018 12:46:11 PM ]. File Size [ 3557 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:49 ]. (Conference Call). (auto-docket).
August 8, 2018 16 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for conference call proceedings held before Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf in Lincoln Courtroom #1 held on 8/8/2018. TRO hearing scheduled for Friday, 8/10/18 at 3:00 p.m. for one hour. There will be a ruling from the bench supplemented by a memo and order if necessary. Defendants to file a brief in opposition by late in day Thursday, 8/9/18. Appearance for Plaintiff: Mark A. Christensen and Nathan Clark; Defendants: Ryan S. Post, James D. Smith, and David A. Lopez. Courtroom Deputy: Colleen Beran; Court Reporter: Digital.Time Start: 2:59 p.m.; Time Stop: 3:12 p.m.; Time in Court: 13 Minutes. (CCB)
August 8, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER that the motion for Expedited Discovery (filing no. 7, part 2) is denied without prejudice. The motion for temporary restraining order (filing no. 7, part 1) remains pending and will be resolved expeditiously. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CCB)
August 8, 2018 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Scott Frakes defendant Scott Frakes. Waiver sent on 8/8/2018. (Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon State of Nebraska defendant State of Nebraska. Waiver sent on 8/8/2018. (Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Nebraska Department of Correctional Services defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. Waiver sent on 8/8/2018. (Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 11 BRIEF in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 10 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Index #9 . by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 9 INDEX in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC.(Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Plaintiff Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Christensen, Mark)
August 8, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - This matter is reassigned to Senior U.S. District Judge Richard G. Kopf as it is related to Case No. 4:99CV3263 and, additionally, in the interests of justice inasmuch as Judge Kopf is intimately familiar with the underlying matters. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (DKM)
August 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James D. Smith on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska (Smith, James)
August 8, 2018 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (LKO)
August 8, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David A. Lopez on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska (Lopez, David)
August 8, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance of Ryan S. Post by Attorney Ryan S. Post on behalf of Defendants Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, Scott Frakes, State of Nebraska (Post, Ryan)
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3737843), by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P)(Christensen, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: #18 Exhibit D (corrected)) (LKO).
August 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3737843), by Attorney Mark A. Christensen on behalf of Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P)(Christensen, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: # 18 Exhibit D (corrected)) (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Danielle L. Rowley
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Represented By: James D. Smith
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frakes
Represented By: Danielle L. Rowley
Represented By: James D. Smith
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Represented By: Danielle L. Rowley
Represented By: James D. Smith
Represented By: Ryan S. Post
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Christensen
Represented By: James M. Bausch
Represented By: Nathan D. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Indiana
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cline Williams Wright Johnson & Oldfather, L.L.P.
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Idaho
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Arizona
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of South Carolina
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Utah
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Florida
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Texas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Alabama
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Nevada
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: State of Georgia
Represented By: Dylan L. Jacobs
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Sandoz, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Christensen
Represented By: Noel B. Ix
Represented By: Andrew Kantra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?