Henne v. Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001
Plaintiff: Janet Henne
Defendant: Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001
Case Number: 4:2018cv03111
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 4 Lincoln Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/5/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001 (Lust, Jeanelle)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to October 4, 2018, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jeanelle R. Lust on behalf of Defendant Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001.(Lust, Jeanelle)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001. (Welding, Nicholas)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. (LKO)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to North Platte Public Schools regarding Complaint, #1 . (Welding, Nicholas)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against North Platte Public Schools, by Attorney Nicholas J. Welding on behalf of Janet Henne Filing fee of $400.00 paid, receipt #4007344. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Welding, Nicholas) Modified on 8/9/2018 to add receipt information (LKO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henne v. Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Henne
Represented By: Nicholas J. Welding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln County School District No. 56-0001
Represented By: Jeanelle R. Lust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?